Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00079
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Gregory Olenar
6310 River Farm Road
Oak Ridge, NC 27310
Represented By
John Gregory Olenar
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/21 9:35 AM
Amended/Amendment to Summons Service Executed on John Gregory Olenar Jr. 4/16/2025. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/16 8:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on John Gregory Olenar Jr. 4/16/2025. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 court Summons Reissued Mon 04/14 11:55 AM
Summons Reissued on John Gregory Olenar Jr. Date Issued 4/14/2025, Answer Due 5/14/2025 (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 04/11 11:36 AM
Summons Issued on John Gregory Olenar Answer Due 05/12/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 11:36 AM
Adversary case 25-00079 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee against John Gregory Olenar (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadline (Private) Mon 04/14 7:00 AM
Answer due by 05/12/2025 (adi)
Related: [-]