Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Sara Lioi
Case #: 5:25-cv-00732
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Western, 2:24-cv-01595
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:11 PM EDT
Defendant
Etchberger Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
Kyle Robert Brady
Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP
contact info
Zachary Joseph Ballard
Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP
contact info
Marco P. DiFlorio
Salmon, Ricchezza, Singer & Turchi, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Royal Chemical Company, Ltd.
Represented By
Frederick M. Erny
Ub Greensfelder
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Deyell
Represented By
George M. Kontos
Kontos Mengine Law Group
contact info
Nicholas C LaCava
Kontos Mengine Killion & Hassen
contact info
Caitlin Michele McDonough
Kontos Mengine Killion & Hassen
contact info
Brittani R. Hassen
Kontos Mengine Killion & Hassen
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Deyell
Represented By
George M. Kontos
Kontos Mengine Law Group
contact info
Nicholas C LaCava
Kontos Mengine Killion & Hassen
contact info
Caitlin Michele McDonough
Kontos Mengine Killion & Hassen
contact info
Brittani R. Hassen
Kontos Mengine Killion & Hassen
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Etchberger Leasing, Inc.
Terminated: 01/30/2025
Represented By
Kyle Robert Brady
Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP
contact info
Zachary Joseph Ballard
Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP
contact info
Marco P. DiFlorio
Salmon, Ricchezza, Singer & Turchi, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Etchberger Group, LLC
Terminated: 01/30/2025
Represented By
Kyle Robert Brady
Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP
contact info
Zachary Joseph Ballard
Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP
contact info
Marco P. DiFlorio
Salmon, Ricchezza, Singer & Turchi, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
54 54 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Thu 05/15 1:27 PM
Case Management Plan and Trial Order. Case is assigned to the Complex Track; Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings 8/15/2025; Deadline for completing fact discovery 1/15/2026; The parties have agreed to a method for conducting discovery of electronically-stored information, including the form or forms in which it should be produced; Deadline for party with burden of proof to identify experts and provide reports 3/30/2026; Deadline to identify rebuttal experts and provide reports 5/29/2026; Deadline for completing expert discovery 7/30/2026; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 8/31/2026; Deadline for filing oppositions to motions 9/30/2026; Deadline for filing replies to responses 10/14/2026; Telephonic Status Conferences set for 8/15/2025 at 11:00 a.m. and 1/15/2026 at 11:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2027 at 1:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set on two week standby period beginning 2/8/2027 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 5/15/2025. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order,
Att: 2 Appendix B - Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Appendix C - Witness List
minutes Case Management Conference Thu 05/15 1:23 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Chief District Judge Sara Lioi. On May 15, 2025, the Court conducted a telephonic case management conference. Attorneys Britanni Hassen, Caitlin McDonough, Nicholas LaCava, Lawrence Pollack, Anthony Santiago, and Samuel Meadows participated. The Court discussed with counsel dates and deadlines that will appear in the Court's case management plan and trial order. The Court discussed with counsel whether the case should be classified as complex. The Court agreed with counsel that the case should receive a complex classification, given the number of parties, issues, and experts that are likely to be employed. Additionally, the Court discussed with counsel their interest in private mediation as set forth in the parties' planning meeting report. The Court encouraged counsel to meet and confer to discuss a possible early mediation either with a private mediator, a member of the Court's ADR panel, or the assigned magistrate judge. Should at any time the parties wish to have the Court refer this matter to mediation, counsel may so indicate in a joint status report or by contacting chambers directly. Finally, as will be set forth in the Case Management Plan, the Court advises counsel that it requires the filing of joint 45-day status reports. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 30 minutes. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
53 53 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 05/13 9:08 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Etchberger Trucking, Inc.. (Meadows, Samuel)
Related: [-]