Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00550
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 1:13 PM CDT
Defendant
Ntirety, Inc.
Plaintiff
CareNexa, LLC
Represented By
Ryan A. Botkin
Botkin Chiarello Calaf PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/16 3:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CareNexa, LLC as to Ntirety, Inc.. Waiver sent on 4/15/2025, answer due 6/16/2025. (Botkin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 notice Deficiency Notice Mon 04/14 3:33 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 3 Request for Issuance of Summons: this summons cannot be issued as requested because you did not complete the section instructing the defendant of the name and address to serve the answer or motion. Please complete this section and resubmit the request. (kp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/11 1:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CareNexa, LLC. (Botkin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Fri 04/11 12:55 PM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by CareNexa, LLC. (Botkin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-20034041). No Summons requested at this time, filed by CareNexa, LLC.(Botkin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 3:27 PM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 04/14 3:27 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]