California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:25-bk-10602
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
World of Mistry, LLC
5900 Sepulveda Blvd Ste 435
Van Nuys, CA 91411-2576
Represented By
Ron Bender
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Todd M Arnold
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Katherine Bunker
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 1:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV) Related [+]. (Bunker, Katherine)
Related: [-] 17 Notice
17 17 notice Notice Tue 04/29 8:15 AM
Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Held Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 341(a) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV) Related [+]. (Bunker, Katherine)
Related: [-] 9 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/7/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 6/20/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/8/2025. (AG1)
Sunday, April 27, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/27 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 25, 2025
15 15 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF) Fri 04/25 4:08 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/25/2025. (JC)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 notice Notice of motion/application Fri 04/25 11:35 AM
Notice of motion/application -[Notice Of Application Of Chapter 11 Debtor And Debtor-In-Possession To Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P. As General Bankruptcy Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 330, And 331 (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC Related [+]. (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-] 13 Application to Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P. as General Bankruptcy Counsel -[Application Of Chapter 11 Debtor And Debtor-In-Possession To Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P. As General Bankruptcy Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 330, And 331; Declaration Of Ron Bender, Esq. In Support Thereof (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC
13 13 motion Employ (motion) Fri 04/25 11:33 AM
Application to Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P. as General Bankruptcy Counsel -[Application Of Chapter 11 Debtor And Debtor-In-Possession To Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P. As General Bankruptcy Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 330, And 331; Declaration Of Ron Bender, Esq. In Support Thereof (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion) Fri 04/25 11:24 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) -[Debtors Motion To Extend Time To File Case Opening Documents (POS attached)]- Filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC (Arnold, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 04/17 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 04/15 2:22 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Silverman, Timothy. (Silverman, Timothy)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2) Tue 04/15 11:02 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/7/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 6/20/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/8/2025. (AG1)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 misc Addendum to Vol Pet Mon 04/14 2:14 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition Amended Voluntary Petition For Non-Individuals Filing For Bankruptcy Filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC. (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Mon 04/14 10:00 AM
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for a Certified Copy Mon 04/14 8:45 AM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :lourdes@lnbyg.com: Filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC Related [+]. (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/14 8:45 AM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:1:25-bk-10602-VK] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58284123. Fee amount 12.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 6
Sunday, April 13, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 04/13 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 04/13 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor World of Mistry, LLC
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 04/11 1:09 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Friedman, Anthony. (Friedman, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 04/11 12:26 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Arnold, Todd. (Arnold, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/11 12:20 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by World of Mistry, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 04/25/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/25/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/25/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/25/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/25/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/25/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/25/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/25/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/25/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 04/25/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/25/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 04/25/2025. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/10/2025. (Bender, Ron)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 04/11 12:27 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:25-bk-10602] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58279013. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1