Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:25-cv-00649
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
DATA INNOVATIONS, LLC
Plaintiff
Juan Morillo
853 Land Avenue
Longwood, FL 32750
Represented By
Jason William Imler
Imler Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/23 1:22 PM
RETURN of service executed on 4/16/25 by Juan Morillo as to Data Innovations, LLC.(Imler, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Executed
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 utility *Remark Wed 04/16 2:42 PM
Remark: Doc.8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/16/2025.(KAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 1:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Order by Juan Morillo. (Imler, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 04/15 1:46 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Juan Morillo. Related case(s): Yes (Imler, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 12 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 1:29 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/15/2025. (EAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 04/15 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason William Imler on behalf of Juan Morillo. Lead Counsel: Jason W. Imler. (Imler, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 04/14 4:04 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Data Innovations, LLC. (EVK)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 04/14 4:01 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Alberto Estuardo Gonzalez, Jason William Imler of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/11 3:15 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:25-cv-649-RBD-RMN. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against DATA INNOVATIONS, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23237949) filed by Juan Morillo.(Imler, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons