Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Robert D Mariani
Case #: 3:25-cv-00653
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:13 PM EDT
Defendant
Big Bass Lake Community Association, Inc.
Plaintiff
Darlene K. Fiscus
Represented By
Gerard Karam
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Christopher A. McDonald
contact info
Stacey A. Scrivani
Stevens & Lee
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 respm Reply Brief Thu 05/08 1:33 PM
REPLY BRIEF re3 MOTION to Expedite Relief with Certificate of Service filed by Darlene K. Fiscus.(Scrivani, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/02 9:31 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by Big Bass Lake Community Association, Inc..(Fecile-Moreland, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 04/24 3:17 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re3 MOTION to Expedite Relief filed by Big Bass Lake Community Association, Inc..(Fecile-Moreland, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 4 Statement Certificate of Service
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 04/24 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Joyce on behalf of Big Bass Lake Community Association, Inc. (Joyce, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 04/24 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Fecile-Moreland on behalf of Big Bass Lake Community Association, Inc. (Fecile-Moreland, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 order Special Admissions Form Approved Mon 04/21 1:59 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christopher A McDonald Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/21/2025. (cac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 11:54 AM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christopher A. McDonald on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Christopher A. McDonald is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6964956.. (McDonald, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
misc Docket Annotation Tue 04/15 9:03 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Scrivani is directed to have attorney McDonald file for special admission (or make arrangements to be generally admitted) and to request e-filing privileges through Pacer.uscourts.gov (all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption). (ea)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Mon 04/14 10:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits and Summons served on Meghan Moore on 4/11/2025, filed by Darlene K. Fiscus. (Scrivani, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Fri 04/11 4:09 PM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/11/2025. (cac)
Related: [-]
4 4 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 04/11 3:00 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT with Certificate of Service re3 MOTION to Expedite Relief filed by Darlene K. Fiscus.(Scrivani, Stacey)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Expedite Fri 04/11 2:52 PM
MOTION to Expedite Relief by Darlene K. Fiscus.(Scrivani, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/11 2:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Big Bass Lake Community Association, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Big Bass Lake Community Association, Inc. ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6960389), filed by Darlene K. Fiscus.(dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Summons