South Carolina District Court
Judge:Mary Geiger Lewis
Referred: Shiva V Hodges
Case #: 3:25-cv-03115
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Case in other court:Sumter County Court of Common Pleas, 2025-CP-43-00548
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:13 PM EDT
Defendant
Sumter School District
Represented By
Allen D Smith
Halligan Mahoney And Williams PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Randal Freeman
16 Hilliard Dr.
Sumter, SC 29150


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
18 18 misc Supplement - Not an attachment to main document Fri 05/16 3:48 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Randal Freeman to5 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION Financial Reimbursement.(cbru, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, May 15, 2025
17 17 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Thu 05/15 5:15 PM
OBJECTION to14 Report and Recommendation by Randal Freeman. Reply to Objections due by 5/29/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(cbru, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Inner Envelope,
Att: 2 Outer Envelope
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
16 16 misc Document Mailed Wed 05/14 11:13 AM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and 15 Transfer of Case Management, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Randal Freeman 16 Hilliard Dr. Sumter, SC 29150. (cpri)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Transfer of Case Management Wed 05/14 11:11 AM
***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Mary Geiger Lewis. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: Matthew J. Perry, Jr. U.S. Courthouse, 901 Richland Street Columbia, SC 29201. (cpri)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 05/14 11:10 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge deny Plaintiff's motion to remand, motion for temporary restraining order, motion for preliminary injunction, and motion for financial reimbursement [ECF No. 5 ] and grant Defendant's motion to dismiss [ECF No. 8 ], dismissing Plaintiff's federal claims and remanding Plaintiffs state-law claims to Sumter County Court of Common Pleas and rendering Plaintiff's motion to remand moot. Objections to R&R due by 5/28/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 05/14/2025. (cpri)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/25 2:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND MOTION for Financial Reimbursement. Response filed by Randal Freeman. (cpri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 date and time stamped cover letter,
Att: 4 Envelope
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 3:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response filed by Randal Freeman. Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/1/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (cpri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Randal K. Freeman,
Att: 2 Supporting Documents,
Att: 3 date and time stamped cover letter,
Att: 4 Envelope
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 11:36 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION Financial Reimbursement Response filed by Sumter School District.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/1/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Smith, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 misc Document Mailed Wed 04/16 2:14 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:9 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Randal Freeman 16 Hilliard Dr. Sumter, SC 29150. (cpri)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Roseboro Order Wed 04/16 2:13 PM
ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward dismissal/summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response to 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM due by 5/19/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 4/16/2025. (cpri )
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/16 1:21 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sumter School District. Response to Motion due by 4/30/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Smith, Allen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 misc Document Mailed Mon 04/14 2:46 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:6 Order to Notify of Address Change, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Randal Freeman 16 Hilliard Dr. Sumter, SC 29150. (cpri )
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order to Notify of Address Change Mon 04/14 2:45 PM
ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 4/14/2025. (cpri)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Remand Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/14 9:39 AM
Emergency MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION Financial Reimbursement by Randal Freeman. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (cpri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 date and time stamped cover letter,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
4 4 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 04/14 9:34 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Randal Freeman.(cpri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 date and time stamped cover letter
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 04/11 3:38 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sumter School District. (cpri)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/11 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Sumter School District from Sumter County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2025-CP 43-00548 (Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number ASCDC-12384039). (cpri )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's State Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's State Pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's State Pleadings