Texas Northern District Court
Judge:A Joe Fish
Case #: 3:25-cv-00911
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:12 PM CDT
Defendant
MCI Diagnostic Center, LLC
13355 Noel Rd. #1310
Dallas, TX 75240
Defendant
Colleen J Payne
5816 Walnut Hill Lane
Dallas, TX 75280
Plaintiff
McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc
9954 Mayland Dr
Richmond, VA 23233
Represented By
Tom Van Arsdel
Winstead PC
contact info
Ciara Perritano
Winstead PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 3:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc filed by McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Perritano, Ciara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 04/22 3:34 PM
ORDER: From the plaintiff's allegations, the court cannot tell whether there is diversity of citizenship or not. Accordingly, no later than 5/2/2025, the plaintiff shall file and serve an amended complaint that alleges the names and citizenship of each member of the defendant MCI Diagnostic Center LLC. Failure to timely file and serve such an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/22/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/22 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Lawrence Vitale on behalf of McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vitale, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 04/22 12:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Perritano, Ciara)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Tue 04/22 11:32 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, no later than May 2, 2025, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/22/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Tue 04/22 11:28 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 3.1 provides that "[t]he complaint must be accompanied by... a separately signed certificate of interested persons...." Accordingly, no later than May 2, 2025, the plaintiff must comply with this rule. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/22/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/14 9:27 AM
Summons Issued as to MCI Diagnostic Center LLC, Colleen J Payne. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 qcref Fish Mon 04/14 9:24 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15417551) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Van Arsdel, Tom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Cover Sheet