Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Henry W Van Eck
Case #: 1:25-bk-01004
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Keystone Passionate Care LLC
2000 Linglestown Road Suite 101
Harrisburg, PA 17110
Represented By
Robert E Chernicoff
Cunningham And Chernicoff PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Represented By
Joseph P Schalk
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
23 23 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Wed 04/30 11:25 AM
Entry of Appearance of Rachel Wolf Filed by Rachel Wolf of DOJ-Ust on behalf of United States Trustee. (Wolf, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Tue 04/29 2:56 PM
Order that a Patient Care Ombudsman shall not be appointed in this case. Related [+]. (McHugh, Michael)Modified on 4/29/2025 (MPM)
Related: [-] 9
21 21 court CSI - Hearing Held (ADI) Tue 04/29 11:04 AM
Proceeding Memo for hearing scheduled on: 04/29/2025 MATTER: Motion of the United States Trustee to Review the Necessity for the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman filed by United States Trustee9 APPEARANCES: Robert Chernicoff, Lisa Rynard, and Joseph Schalk. DISPOSITION: Hearing on Motion of the United States Trustee to Review the Necessity for the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman held. Record made. Court to enter appropriate order. (Wilson, Tonia)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 motion Extend Time Fri 04/25 1:37 PM
Motion to Extend Time to file Schedules, Statements and other Documents Required by FRBP 1007(b). Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of Keystone Passionate Care LLC Related [+]. (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
19 19 misc Request for Notices under 2002 Fri 04/25 10:03 AM
Request for Notice under 2002 & Filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PA - UCTS. (Mitten, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
18 18 motion Authorize Post Petition Retainer Wed 04/23 8:51 AM
Motion to Authorize Post Petition Retainer and Notice of Preliminary Self Scheduled Hearing with Objection Deadline. Notice served on 4/23/2025. Filed by Trustee. Objections due by 5/7/2025. Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2025 at 09:30 AM - U.S. Courthouse, 1501 N. 6th St. Harrisburg, PA. (Rynard, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 18, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice) Sat 04/19 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice) Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 11)) Sat 04/19 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 11)) Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
15 15 misc Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing) Fri 04/18 3:14 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of Keystone Passionate Care LLC Related [+]. (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit Served Subchapter V Scheduling Order and Notice
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice (Order setting status hearing) Fri 04/18 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Order setting status hearing) Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
13 13 court Hearing Wed 04/16 1:56 PM
Notice setting hearing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/29/2025 at 09:30 AM at Sylvia H. Rambo US Courthouse, 1501 N. 6th St, Bankruptcy Ctrm 4B, 4th Fl, Harrisburg, PA 17102. (McHugh, Michael)
Related: [-] 9
12 12 court Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 11) Wed 04/16 9:25 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Request submitted to BNC for mailing 341(a) meeting to be held 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM - for Ch 11 only. The 341 meeting will be conducted by telephone. Refer to the call-in instructions. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 7/13/2025. (McHugh, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 trustee Meeting of Creditors Scheduled (Ch. 11) Tue 04/15 4:06 PM
Clerk to provide notice of meeting of creditors to all parties in interest. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by U.S. Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held 5/14/2025 at 02:00 PM - for Ch 11 only. The 341 meeting will be conducted by telephone. Refer to the call-in instructions. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Subchapter V Scheduling Order and Notice Tue 04/15 12:00 PM
Subchapter V Scheduling Order and Notice . Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 6/10/2025 at 09:30 AM - Sylvia H. Rambo US Courthouse, 1501 N. 6th St, Bankruptcy Ctrm 4B, 4th Fl, Harrisburg, PA 17102. (McHugh, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
9 9 motion Generic Motion or Application Tue 04/15 9:06 AM
Motion of the United States Trustee t o Review the Necessity for the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by Joseph P Schalk of DOJ-Ust on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 trustee Add Trustee by US Trustee Tue 04/15 8:40 AM
The US Trustee appoints Lisa Ann Rynard to serve as trustee in this Chapter 11 Small business Subchapter V case. Notice of Electronic filing herein represents the official trustee appointment by the US Trustee. Filed by U.S. Trustee.(Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Rynard
Sunday, April 13, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission) Mon 04/14 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission) Related [+]. Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission) Mon 04/14 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice (Ch 11 document sent to the Securities and Exchange Commission) Related [+]. Notice Date 04/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 court Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents) Fri 04/11 3:39 PM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. (McHugh, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Fri 04/11 1:30 PM
Entry of Appearance of Joseph P. Schalk Filed by Joseph P Schalk of DOJ-Ust on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Fri 04/11 12:51 PM
For Non-Individual Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of Keystone Passionate Care LLC. (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed) Fri 04/11 12:49 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of Keystone Passionate Care LLC Related [+]. (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/11 12:46 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Small Business, SubChapter V . Filing fee due in the amount of $1738.00. Filed by Robert E Chernicoff of Cunningham and Chernicoff PC on behalf of Keystone Passionate Care LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 05/11/2025 (Chernicoff, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Financial Statements
Att: 2 Exhibit 2023 Tax Return
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Fri 04/11 12:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:25-bk-01004] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11431009, amount $ 1738.00. Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1