Washington Western District Court
Judge:James L Robart
Case #: 2:25-cv-00661
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:08 PM PDT
Defendant
SSA Terminals, LLC
Plaintiff
OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE, LTD
Represented By
Olivia Thompson
Legros Buchanan & Paul (wa)
contact info
Markus B G Oberg
Legros Buchanan & Paul (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 2:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ocean Network Express Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nippon Yusen Kaisha, Other Affiliate Mitsui O.S.K. Lines Ltd., Other Affiliate Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha Ltd. for Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Ocean Network Express Pte Ltd. (Oberg, Markus)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 04/14 1:06 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) SSA Terminals LLC (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/14 12:49 PM
Judge James L. Robart added. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Mon 04/14 1:01 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff Ocean Network Express PTE Ltd must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/21/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(HH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) SSA Terminals, LLC Related [+] filed by OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE, LTD.(Oberg, Markus)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8927493
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons