Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tiffany P Geyer
Case #: 6:25-bk-02112
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Wave Asian Bistro, LLC
301 N Baker St Ste 101
Mount Dora, FL 32757-5551
Represented By
Jeffrey Ainsworth
Bransonlaw PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
30 30 2 pgs court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 04/24 10:50 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Jeffrey Ainsworth (Debtor), L Todd Budgen, SubV Trustee, Wanda Murray (UST), Jonathan McKinney, Principal RULING: Initial Status Conference Pre-Status Conference Report (Doc #20), Preliminary Hearing: 1) Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Doc #11): Granted on an Interim Basis to a Continued Hearing Scheduled 6/18/2025 at 10:00 AM; Order by Ainsworth 2) Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Doc #13): Granted on an Interim Basis to a Continued Hearing Scheduled 6/18/2025 at 10:00 AM; Order by Ainsworth (NH) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Proof of Service (BK) Wed 04/23 10:42 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Amended Motion For Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC Related [+]. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 23
28 28 misc Proof of Service (BK) Wed 04/23 10:36 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting on an Interim Basis Motion to Use Cash Collateral through April 23, 2025. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC Related [+]. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 19
Sunday, April 20, 2025
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Saturday, April 19, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/20 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #19 )
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sun 04/20 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
Friday, April 18, 2025
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/19 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
23 23 order Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Fri 04/18 11:24 AM
Order Granting Amended Motion For Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Bittakis, Megan)Modified on 4/18/2025 (MB)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, April 17, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Fri 04/18 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
21 21 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Thu 04/17 4:00 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Amended Motion for Authority to Pay Employees for PrePetition Wages and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC Related [+]. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 17
20 20 misc Pre-Status Conference Report Thu 04/17 3:53 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c) Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 04/17 12:10 PM
Order Granting on an Interim Basis Motion to Use Cash Collateral Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 11:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Megan B.)
Related: [-] 11
18 18 3 pgs order Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf Thu 04/17 10:21 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 11:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Penny)
Related: [-] 10 ,1
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 motion Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Wed 04/16 2:46 PM
Amended Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] 12
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Wed 04/16 10:59 AM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Use Cash Collateral; Motion for Autortiy to Pay Pre-Petition Wages; and Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 11:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,11
15 15 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Wed 04/16 10:12 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/12/2025 at 11:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 6/20/2025. (Lisa P.)
Related: [-]
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/16 10:16 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/23/2025 11:30 am Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion to Use Cash Collateral Doc11 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jeffrey Ainsworth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 11
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/16 10:17 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/23/2025 11:30 am Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Doc12 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jeffrey Ainsworth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 12
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/16 10:18 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/23/2025 11:30 am Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Emergency Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Doc13 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jeffrey Ainsworth to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate of Necessity (BK) Tue 04/15 7:25 PM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC Related [+]. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,11
13 13 motion Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries Tue 04/15 7:06 PM
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Tue 04/15 7:03 PM
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion to Use Cash Collateral Tue 04/15 5:28 PM
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Tue 04/15 4:47 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary AND STATUS REPORT Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Tue 04/15 1:21 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . L. Todd Budgen added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for May 12, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. telephonically via US Trustee - Orlando. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement
8 8 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Tue 04/15 9:10 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Case Management Summary not filed. . (Dana B.)
Related: [-]
misc Emergency Matters Submission Notification Tue 04/15 7:27 PM
Emergency Matters Submission Notification Re: Motion to Use Cash Collateral; Motion to Pay Affiliate Officer; and Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages to be heard on or before April 18, 2025 Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC Related [+]. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,11
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only) Mon 04/14 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Wanda D Murray on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Murray, Wanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement (BK) Mon 04/14 10:59 AM
Verified Statement PURSUANT TO 11 USC §1116(1)(B) Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Tax Documents Mon 04/14 10:15 AM
Tax Documents for the Year 2023 Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Sat 04/12 3:46 PM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/12 3:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Robert B Branson on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. (Branson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 04/11 7:54 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/11 7:51 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Wave Asian Bistro, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 07/10/2025. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 04/11 8:04 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:25-bk-02112] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A79241480, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 04/11 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]