Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:25-bk-41037
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 09, 2025

Debtor
Credit Diva Of Dallas, Inc
2150 S Central Expy Ste 200
McKinney, TX 75070-4000
Represented By
Guy Harvey Holman
Guy Harvey Holman, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michelle Chow
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 16200 Addison Road, Suite 140
Addison, TX 75001
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 04/12/2025 12:06 AM CDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
crditcrd none Fri 04/11 5:18 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules & Statements (fee)-case upload([LINK 25-41037 ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13871059, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7, All Schedules & Statements [fee]-case upload Fri 04/11 5:13 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules A-J, Statements, Matrix, and All Other Required Documents(Uploaded electronically). Filed by Guy Harvey Holman of Guy Harvey Holman, PLLC on behalf of Credit Diva Of Dallas, Inc. Document Due 4/18/2025. (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Fri 04/11 5:21 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by Credit Diva Of Dallas, Inc Related [+]. (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules A-J, Statements, Matrix, and All Other Required Documents(Uploaded electronically). Filed by Guy Harvey Holman of Guy Harvey Holman, PLLC on behalf of Credit Diva Of Dallas, Inc. Document Due 4/18/2025. filed by Debtor Credit Diva Of Dallas, Inc
3 3 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Fri 04/11 11:46 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Chow, Michelle with 341(a)
Related: [-]