California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01677
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 12:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Carmen Zusely Shenassa
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Thomas J. Sommer
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/12/2025 2:41 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
Arrest of Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda (no document attached) (rlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda.(rlw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda: Initial Appearance set for 4/10/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda held on 4/10/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda.. Rule 5 Advisement provided. Financial Affidavit filed. Detention Hearing as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda held on 4/10/2025. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention prepared by Court.Preliminary Hearing set for 4/24/25 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Arraignment set for 5/08/25 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.(Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 4/10/2025 2:38; 2:54-3:02). (Plaintiff Attorney Tyler Bramlett, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Mayra Lopez, FD). (tkl)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda (no document attached) (tkl)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 4/10/25. (ecf)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda (ave)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Dalia Isabel Valenzuela Castaneda. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 4/10/2025. (ave)
Related: [-]