South Dakota District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00087
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Nelson Rivera-Ruiz (1)
Represented By
Amanda D. Kippley
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Connie Larson
U.S. Attorney'S Office (sioux Falls, Sd)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/12/2025 4:33 AM CDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
Attorney update in case as to Nelson Rivera-Ruiz. Attorney Amanda D. Kippley for Nelson Rivera-Ruiz added. Set/Reset Hearings as to Nelson Rivera-Ruiz:( Initial Appearance set for 4/11/2025 at 01:30 PM in Pierre Courtroom 1 before US Magistrate Judge Mark A. Moreno. Remote Video Conference Hearing set for 4/11/2025 at 01:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 3.) (JM)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy as to Nelson Rivera-Ruiz (1). NOTICE REGARDING COOPERATOR INFORMATION: All plea agreements and sentencing memoranda contain a sealed supplement which includes either a statement there was cooperation or a statement there was no cooperation. It is not possible to determine from examination of docket entries whether a defendant did or did not cooperate with the government. (SKK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed Charging Document
2 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support of1 Complaint filed by USA as to Nelson Rivera-Ruiz (SKK)
Related: [-]