Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00074
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 3:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Jaime Escuder - FPD
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin Cayton
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/12/2025 5:01 AM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
Arrest of Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez. (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez held on 3/12/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 3/20/2025 09:30 AM in Pecos before Judge David B. Fannin,), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez, Oral Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez (Court Reporter FTR-ALPINE.) (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez. (jh1) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez (Escuder - FPD, Jaime) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (r013) [4:25-mj-00133-DF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Pecos Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez (bot1)
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Julio Cesar Flores-Lopez (bot2)
Related: [-]