District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00070
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 3:31 AM EDT
Defendant
TALIB ABDUL-WALI (1)
Represented By
Ubong E. Akpan
Federal Public Defender For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Michael Dreher
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/12/2025 5:54 AM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to TALIB ABDUL WALI (1). (zstd) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Statement of Facts
Monday, March 03, 2025
Arrest of TALIB ABDUL WALI (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by TALIB ABDUL WALI. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Temporary Detention by USA as to TALIB ABDUL WALI. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Return on Arrest Warrant/Initial Appearance as to TALIB ABDUL WALI held on 3/3/2025. Defendant present in the courtroom. The Court advised the Government of its Due Process Obligations under Rule 5(f). Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to TALIB ABDUL WALI; heard and granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Temporary Detention (3 day hold) as to TALIB ABDUL WALI; heard and granted. Detention Hearing set for 3/4/2025 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 5- In Person before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Held Without Bond; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 5: [1:18:49-1:27:21]; Defense Attorney: Ubong Akpan; US Attorney: Adam Dreher; Pretrial Officer: Shania Fennell. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to TALIB ABDUL WALI: As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 3/3/2025. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/3/2025 as to TALIB ABDUL WALI. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
6 6 5 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Pretrial Detention by USA as to TALIB ABDUL WALI (Dreher, Adam) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General by USA as to TALIB ABDUL WALI. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Release from Custody by TALIB ABDUL WALI. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Detention Hearing as to TALIB ABDUL WALI held on 3/4/2025. Defendant present in the courtroom. Continued Detention Hearing set for 3/10/2025 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 5- In Person before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Held Without Bond; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 5: [3:20:14-4:18:17][RECESS: 4:17:18-4:25:09][4:25:10-4:26:45]; Defense Attorney: Ubong Akpan; US Attorney: Adam Dreher; Pretrial Officer: Britney Dahlkoetter. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
7 7 13 pgs Memorandum in Opposition by TALIB ABDUL WALI re MOTION to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General(Akpan, Ubong) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Sunday, March 09, 2025
8 8 Supplemental re6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Pretrial Detention by USA as to TALIB ABDUL WALI (Dreher, Adam) Modified text and to add link on 3/10/2025 (zstd). [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to TALIB ABDUL WALI. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya: Continued Detention Hearing as to TALIB ABDUL WALI held on 3/10/2025. Defendant present in the courtroom. Oral Motion by the Government to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General as to TALIB ABDUL WALI; heard and denied. Oral Motion for Release from Custody as to TALIB ABDUL WALI; heard and granted. Defendant sworn into Conditions of Release. Delonda Williams and Angela Thompson sworn in as 3rd Party Custodians. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to TALIB ABDUL WALI; heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded between 3/10/2025 to 3/27/2025 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Defendant request Preliminary Hearing. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/27/2025 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 5- In Person before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Sharbaugh. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Released/Release Issued; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 5: [1:15:27-2:26:17][RECESS: 2:26:18-3:01:35][3:01:36-3:54:47]; Defense Attorney: Ubong Akpan; US Attorney: Adam Dreher; Pretrial Officer: Britney Dahlkoetter; 3rd Party Custodians: Delonda Williams- Girlfriend & Angela Thompson- Mother. (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to TALIB ABDUL WALI (1) Personal Recognizance/HISP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 3/10/2025. (Attachment: #1 Appearance Bond) (znjb) [1:25-mj-00029-MAU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 INDICTMENT as to TALIB ABDUL-WALI (1) count(s) 1. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zljn)
Related: [-]