Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00240
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Aboubacar Kaba (1)
Represented By
Suzanne Hashimi
Federal Defender Program Inc.-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul Rhinehart Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/12/2025 5:42 AM EDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
Arrest (Rule 5(c)(3)) of Aboubacar Kaba. (dob)
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Aboubacar Kaba: Preliminary Hearing set for 3/27/2025 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2008 before Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jpa)
Related: [-]
1 1 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Aboubacar Kaba held on 3/13/2025. Defendant ORALLY WAIVED an identity hearing. Preliminary hearing set for Thursday, March 27, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. Government motion for detention filed. (Tape #FTR) (jpa) Modified attachment 1 to remove personal identifier page from warrant on 3/17/2025 (bgt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging document
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Aboubacar Kaba (jpa)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Suzanne Hashimi as to Aboubacar Kaba. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 3/13/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings (Identity hearing and production of the warrant) by Aboubacar Kaba. (jpa)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Aboubacar Kaba. (jpa)
Related: [-]