Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-07406
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 12:21 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jesus Alexander Vazquez-Sanchez (1)
Terminated: 03/24/2025
Represented By
Jessica Valdez
Law Office Of Jessica Valdez PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 12:56 AM MST
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
Arrest of Jesus Alexander Vazquez-Sanchez on 3/12/2025. (JRW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jesus Alexander Vazquez-Sanchez. (JRW)
Related: [-]