Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00048
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 2:19 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean Long-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Javier David Tapia-Heredia (1)
Terminated: 04/09/2025
Represented By
Wade William Iverson-FPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - AB/LU/SA
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 2:53 AM CDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
NOTICE: Charging Documents emailed to the AUSA, Agent, Marshals, and Probation as to Javier Tapia-Heredia. (bmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Javier Tapia-Heredia (1). (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.)In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (bmh) Modified restrictions on 3/19/2025 (mcrd).
Related: [-]