Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00726
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 2:27 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Duarte, II
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jose Antonio Castro-Bustamante (1)
Terminated: 04/09/2025
Represented By
Alan Aguirre-Rivera
Federal Public Defender, Txw Del Rio
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 3:00 AM CDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
Arrest of Jose Antonio Castro-Bustamante (drda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Jose Antonio Castro-Bustamante. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jose Antonio Castro-Bustamante. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jose Antonio Castro-Bustamante. (drda)
Related: [-]