California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephen L Johnson
Case #: 5:25-bk-50519
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025
Claims Deadline:Aug 18, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lojerky, Inc.
3624 Humbolt Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95051
Represented By
Vinod Nichani
Nichani Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Not Assigned - SJ
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 30 seconds ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 motion Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 4:52 PM
Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . Fee Amount $328 (Boyd, Keith)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Extend Time Fri 04/25 10:34 AM
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Required Documents Related [+] Incomplete Filings due by 5/9/2025 for , (al)
Related: [-] 12
crditcrd none Fri 04/25 4:56 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice([LINK 25-50519 ) [motion,mprohac] ( 328.00). Receipt number A33825618, amount $ 328.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#14 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . Fee Amount $328
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 motion Extend Time Wed 04/23 11:57 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Required Documents Filed by Debtor Lojerky, Inc. (Nichani, Vinod)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/17 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pmt of State and Fed Taxes Thu 04/17 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Payment of State and Fed Taxes. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/16 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order to File Missing Documents
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/16 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Generate 341 Notices
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 order Status Conference Chp 11 Tue 04/15 9:25 AM
Order and Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference Status Conference scheduled for 6/4/2025 at 11:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Status Conference Statement due by 5/28/2025 (lj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 order Payment of Taxes Mon 04/14 10:30 PM
Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Generate 341 Notices Mon 04/14 3:59 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (lj)
Related: [-]
4 4 order File Missing Documents Mon 04/14 3:40 PM
Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal . (lj)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/14 11:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul Gregory Leahy. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ (Leahy, Paul)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Sun 04/13 4:30 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM via UST Teleconference, Call in number/URL: 1-877-991-8832 Passcode: 4101242. Proofs of Claims due by 8/18/2025. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 04/13 12:03 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Lojerky, Inc.. Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 05/13/2025. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 04/21/2025. (Nichani, Vinod)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Sun 04/13 12:03 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-50519 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A33800355, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)