Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Eduardo I Sanchez
Case #: 1:25-cv-21687
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2025
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 1:03 AM EDT
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff
Christian Dior Couture, S.A.
Represented By
David B. Rosemberg
Rosemberg Law
contact info

GPO May 12 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 5/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (EIS)
GPO May 15 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: adopting Report and Recommendations re 45 Report and Recommendations; granting 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)

Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
47 47 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Thu 05/15 1:20 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: adopting Report and Recommendations re45 Report and Recommendations; granting8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
46 46 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 05/13 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of a Certain Defendant by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Wokoun, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
45 45 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 05/12 11:08 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 5/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (EIS)
Related: [-]
44 44 respm Response/Reply (Other) Mon 05/12 11:40 AM
Supplemental Memorandum to43 Order to Show Cause, by Christian Dior Couture, S.A..(Wokoun, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Wokoun, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9
Friday, May 09, 2025
43 43 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 05/09 8:15 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING on8 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff should file the additional briefing by noon on May 12, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 5/9/2025. See attached document for full details. (ab05)
Related: [-]
42 42 minutes MOTION Hearing or Evidentiary Motion Hearing Fri 05/09 11:47 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2025. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 5/9/2025. The Court heard from Plaintiff; reasons stated on the record. None of the Defendants appeared for the hearing. The Court will take the matter under advisement. Report and Recommendation to follow. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David B. Rosemberg, (counsel for the Plaintiff) (Digital 11:18:18) (ogn1)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 05/13 10:51 AM
Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 5/9/2025 per D.E. #42. (kan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
41 41 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 05/06 9:29 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re40 Summons Returned Executed. Docket Text Does Not Match Document ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
40 40 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/05 10:25 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christian Dior Couture, S.A..(Wokoun, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Wokoun Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
39 39 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 05/05 9:28 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re36 Summons Returned Executed,. Docket Text Does Not Match Document ; ERROR - The Filer failed to follow the instructions when docketing this event, i.e. ATTENTION!!! DO NOT SELECT ANY GROUPS!!! HOLD DOWN THE CONTROL BUTTON (Ctrl) AND SELECT INDIVIDUALS ONLY!!! (ls) (ls)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 05/05 7:54 AM
Clerk's NOTICE of Compliance re37 Order on Motion to Unseal Case: All Docket Entries Unsealed. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Case Mon 05/05 7:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO UNSEAL granting31 Motion to Unseal Case. The Clerk of the Court is hereby DIRECTED to unseal all docket entries in this case and return those portions of the Court file to the public records. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
36 36 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 05/02 1:47 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christian Dior Couture, S.A.. All Defendants.(Wokoun, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Wokoun Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
35 35 notice Notice of Striking Fri 05/02 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Striking32 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 05/02 8:17 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re32 Summons Returned Executed,. Login/Signature Block Violation ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and LR 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. AND Docket Text Does Not Match Document ; ERROR - The Filer failed to follow the instructions when docketing this event, i.e. ATTENTION!!! DO NOT SELECT ANY GROUPS!!! HOLD DOWN THE CONTROL BUTTON (Ctrl) AND SELECT INDIVIDUALS ONLY!!! (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 05/01 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. re27 Order on Motion to Continue,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,, (Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
32 32 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 05/01 1:54 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christian Dior Couture, S.A.. All Defendants.(Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Service Declaration
31 31 motion Unseal Case Thu 05/01 1:47 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal Case by Christian Dior Couture, S.A.. Responses due by 5/15/2025.(Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF Wed 04/30 12:43 PM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 6 Order on Motion to Seal,,, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Dongguan Chenmei Leather Goods Co., Ltd., Dongguan City Shishe Leather Goods Co., Ltd., Dongguan Sanniu Clothing Co., Ltd., Dongguan Suofeiao Metal Jewelry Ltd., Fuzhou Internet Star Information Technology Co., Ltd., Gaobeidian Jianuo Bag Trading Co., Ltd., Guangxi Tusheng Trading Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Hao Long Industrial Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Longda Leather Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Panyu District Da Long Jun Yu Ying Ye Bags Shop, Guangzhou Yesi Leather Goods Co., Ltd, MiFaktory Limited, Shanghai Youjijia Import And Export Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Nanshan District Junze Hongyi Commodity Business Department, Shenzhen Suntour Outdoor Product Co., Ltd., Tedix fashion Co., Limited, Wenzhou Yuanqiao Leather Goods Co., Ltd., Xaimen Yuntonghang E-Commerce Co., Ltd., Xiamen Jimei District Fucai Hengtong E-Commerce Service Department (individual Business), Xian Dongyuan Import And Export Company Limited, Yiwu Muke Trading Co., Ltd., Yiwu Noyer Bags Ltd., Yiwu Rebaccas Jewelry&Craft Factory, Yiwu Zandy Import & Export Co., Ltd., anmaogongsi, Champ3, FENGFANDI, JJIVANNA, KENZHANG, KUKIMA, LLYYDM, longerlonger, QDDDMYXD, ShuDanN, XUWEICHAO, yizewangluo, zhisaizhanjingshangmaoyouxiangongsi, aabb86632, dolphin.295405, fashion_nuo, je.nn6987, luxurydesignerbags_china, studiomidsummer, sunlight__fashion, yami.yu4, etrendysalon88, Chic Dude Closet, GoyaTee, maikezhan, WDDDDHD, charlottesfindsv2, dana.stone70, factory.wholesale1, ilovelv8, july.ladyzzz, luxury_china_128, luxury8037, luxurybags427, menbrand131, tab.gissing, uatoochatou1856, wa86_18407830386, zkpqgwo7yfeu, 188sale.com, 7purse.com, bagdirect.top, bagsch.com, bmlin.net, coeboutiques.com, exactreproduction.store, fancykick.ru, fashionreplicahandbags.com, ganebet.com, hoshiboutiques.com, jessesboutique.ru, leuslierstore.com, lucaskick.com, luxdupes.com, shopdripitaly.com, superabc.online, uootd.com, BinbinShoes, chanelworkshop and viv_marsa. (Wokoun, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
29 29 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 12:48 PM
Summons Issued as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Mon 04/28 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
Thursday, April 24, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 04/24 6:42 PM
ORDER granting23 Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend the Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 5/7/2025. Replies due by 5/8/2025. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is RESCHEDULED for 5/9/2025, at 11:20 AM before the Honorable Eduardo I. Sanchez in Courtroom 6 of the C. Clyde Atkins United States Courthouse, located at 301 N. Miami Avenue in Miami, Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (ab05)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/24 2:41 PM
ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order, granting22 Motion. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (ksr)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 04/24 8:30 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re23 MOTION to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule re14 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, Order,, . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 04/24 8:24 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re22 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order . Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 3:46 PM
MOTION to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule re14 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, Order,, by Christian Dior Couture, S.A..(Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 3:44 PM
MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order by Christian Dior Couture, S.A..(Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Wokoun, Esq.,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 notice Notice of Striking Wed 04/23 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Striking17 MOTION to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule re14 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, Order,, filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Striking Wed 04/23 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Striking16 MOTION to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 04/23 3:29 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re17 MOTION to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule re14 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, Order,, . Document Not Related to Case ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile the document in the appropriate case. (ls)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 04/23 3:25 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re16 MOTION to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order . Document Not Related to Case ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile the document in the appropriate case. (ls)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 3:15 PM
MOTION to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule re14 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, Order,, by Christian Dior Couture, S.A..(Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 3:14 PM
MOTION to Extend Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order by Christian Dior Couture, S.A..(Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David Wokoun, Esq.,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/22 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Bond Filing and Compliance with Order by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/17 4:53 PM
ORDER Setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 4/27/2025 at 3:00 p.m., Replies due by 4/28/2025 at 10:00 a.m., Preliminary Injunction Hearing is SET for April 28, 2025, at 02:30 PM before the Honorable Eduardo I. Sanchez in Courtroom 6 of the C. Clyde Atkins United States Courthouse, located at 301 N. Miami Avenue in Miami, Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 4/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (ab05)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/17 2:16 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez for events only. Motions referred to Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez per DE 12 . (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion to Seal Mon 04/14 11:33 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Seal. Schedule A to Plaintiff's Complaint and the Summonses may be filed under seal until the Court has the opportunity to rule on the Plaintiff's request for temporary ex parte relief and, if granted, the relief ordered therein has been effectuated. Schedule A and the Summonses shall be kept under seal by the Clerk until further order from this Court. Within seven (7) days of completing service, Plaintiff shall add all of the Defendants as parties through CM/ECF. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for statistical purposes pending service on Defendants. This shall not affect the Parties' substantive rights. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/14/2025. (bbp)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Motion to Seal (Public) Mon 04/14 11:27 AM
MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Christian Dior Couture, S.A.. (Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/14 11:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christian Dior Couture, S.A. identifying Corporate Parent Christian Dior S.A. for Christian Dior Couture, S.A. (Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Form AO 120/121 Mon 04/14 10:04 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ksr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/14 12:00 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ls)(per DE #6)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 04/14 9:56 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ksr)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 04/12 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18362341, filed by Christian Dior Couture, S.A..(Rosemberg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet