California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:25-bk-10500
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 22, 2025

Debtor
SBJC Oxnard, LLC
571 Town Center Dr Ste 3045
Oxnard, CA 93036-1147
Represented By
John K Rounds
Rounds & Sutter, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Sandra McBeth (TR)
7343 El Camino Real, #185
Atascadero, CA 93422
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 12:01 AM PDT
Sunday, April 13, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sun 04/13 5:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:9:25-bk-10500] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58282976. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sun 04/13 5:25 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by SBJC Oxnard, LLC (Rounds, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Sun 04/13 7:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee McBeth (TR), Sandra with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/22/2025 at 09:30 AM via Zoom - McBeth: Meeting ID 902 575 1887, Passcode 1216388636, Phone 1 804 552 2201. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]