California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:25-cv-03005
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 1:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Volunteer of America
Plaintiff
Detra J Dezeurn
449 E 49th St No. 2
Los Angeles, CA 90011


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 04/30 12:31 PM
ORDER by Judge Anne Hwang DENYING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)3 , this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 04/13 12:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 04/13 12:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 04/13 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Anne Hwang and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Sun 04/13 12:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by Plaintiff Detra J Dezeurn. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Sun 04/13 12:05 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Detra J Dezeurn. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sun 04/13 12:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Detra J Dezeurn (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Sun 04/13 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendant Volunteer of America. Case assigned to Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff, filed by Plaintiff Detra J Dezeurn. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet