California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:25-cv-03246
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
C T Corporation System 818 W Seventh St., 2nd Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
Defendant
Transunion, LLC
Plaintiff
Christopher DiGiacinto
Represented By
Peng Shao
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/13 11:04 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE17 issued on 5/9/2025 is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mal)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 misc Response Fri 05/09 2:05 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacintoto Order to Show Cause17 (Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Errata Fri 05/09 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),10 as to Defendant NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ONLY (Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/09 12:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto. upon Navy Federal Credit Union waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/30/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. Waiver of Service signed by Counsel for Navy Federal Credit Union. (Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 05/09 11:51 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/13/2025 OR 5/15/2025. (ANS/DEFAULT Navy Federal Credit Union) (jre)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 05/08 9:36 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/9/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/07 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc, identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Taylor, Angela)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/07 5:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Attorney Angela M Taylor added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft))(Taylor, Angela)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 05/07 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Transunion, LLC. (Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/07 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 05/07 10:57 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 6/6/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 04/22 12:17 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025; Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025; Navy Federal Credit Union served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025; Transunion, LLC served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kabiri, Hoosai)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/16 10:07 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (mal)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/16 8:55 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Navy Federal Credit Union, Transunion, LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/15 6:17 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/15 6:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/15 6:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Sat 04/12 2:53 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto. (Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sat 04/12 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto, (Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Sat 04/12 2:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto. (Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sat 04/12 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39495751 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Christopher DiGiacinto. (Attorney Peng Shao added to party Christopher DiGiacinto(pty:pla))(Shao, Peng)
Related: [-]