Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Costello
Case #: 2:25-cv-01899
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause29:1362 ERISA
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 1:09 PM EDT
Defendant
FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-10
Defendant
TRUSTEES OF WEBER INSURANCE 401(K) PLAN
161 WINDHAM COURT
NEWTOWN, PA 18940
Defendant
JAMES WEBER
Plaintiff
BARBARA G. WEBER
913 PUTNAM ROAD
YARDLEY, PA 19067
Represented By
ALAN L. FRANK
Alan L. Frank Law Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILMER S. WEBER, JR.


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Arbitration Tue 05/06 8:32 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO THE COURTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARY KAY COSTELLO ON 5/5/25. 5/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 8:31 AM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARY KAY COSTELLO ON 5/5/25. 5/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Mon 05/05 12:20 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY, IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 6/10/2025, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARY KAY COSTELLO ON 5/5/25. 5/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 05/05 12:18 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ALISON V. DOUGLASS, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.9 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARY KAY COSTELLO ON 5/5/25.5/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 05/05 12:16 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NEHAMA HANOCH, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.10 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARY KAY COSTELLO ON 5/5/25.5/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 05/01 2:50 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 05/01 2:48 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FMR LLC by FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY.(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 05/01 2:45 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Nehama Hanoch ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18258791.) filed by FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 05/01 2:43 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Alison V. Douglass ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18258765.) filed by FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/01 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS M. GALLAGHER on behalf of FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/29 3:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Christopher Lemerise re: served Summons and Complaint upon James Weber on Behalf of Trustees of Weber Insurance 401k Plan by Personal Service on 4-23-25 (FRANK, ALAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/29 3:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Christopher Lemerise re: served Summons and Complaint upon James Weber by Personal Service on 4-23-25 (FRANK, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 04/25 11:18 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jana Nell re: served Summons and Complaint upon Fidelity Management and Research Company by Personal Service on 4-17-25 (FRANK, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 8:03 AM
Summons Issued as to FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY, TRUSTEES OF WEBER INSURANCE 401(K) PLAN, JAMES WEBER. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 4/15/2025 (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/14 2:02 PM
NOTICE by BARBARA G. WEBER re1 Complaint (Attorney), Revised Designation Form (FRANK, ALAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Mon 04/14 1:11 PM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 04/14 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT against FIDELITY MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH COMPANY A/K/A FMR, LLC, D/B/A FIDELITY INVESTMENTS, JOHN DOE 1-10, TRUSTEES OF WEBER INSURANCE 401(K) PLAN, JAMES WEBER ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18215026.), filed by BARBARA G. WEBER.(FRANK, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Verification,
Att: 4 Verification,
Att: 5 Ex. A,
Att: 6 Ex. B,
Att: 7 Ex. C,
Att: 8 Ex. D
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 04/14 1:09 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The related case question has to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]