New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:25-cv-03060
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause7:25 Fraud - Commodities Leverage Contracts
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Aux Cayes Fintech Co. LTD.
Defendant
Phantom Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Emma Elizabeth McGrath
Morrison Cohen
contact info
Jason P. Gottlieb
Morrison Cohen, Llp (ny)
contact info
Daniel Cahen Isaacs
Morrison Cohen, Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Liam Murphy
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Sustaita
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabrielle Reed
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Walker Post
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Trevor Perry
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex Perry
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Allton
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Graham Murphy
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Joy Morgan
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. James Morgan
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Miranda
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Traviis Massengale
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Jessica-Dilks
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info
Plaintiff
Cassidy Hooper
Represented By
Thomas Liam Murphy
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Fri 05/02 5:29 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Jason Gottlieb dated May 2, 2025 re: confirmation of compliance with the April 30, 2025 Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Phantom Technologies, Inc...(Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/30 1:40 PM
ORDER granting in part9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED in part. The Court has considered the request and Plaintiffs' opposition letter and finds good cause for the requested extension. The deadline for Phantom to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to June 16, 2025. If Phantom files its contemplated motion to compel arbitration and dismiss the Complaint, any opposition is due by July 25, 2025, and any reply is due by August 8, 2025, or two weeks after the opposition brief is filed, whichever is earlier. The opening and opposition briefs may not exceed 10,000 words, and any reply may not exceed 4,000 words. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 6/16/2025. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/30/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 04/30 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/30/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/30 1:41 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Phantom Technologies, Inc. answer due 6/16/2025. Responses due by 7/25/2025 Replies due by 8/8/2025. (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/22 3:19 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Liam Murphy dated April 22, 2025 re:9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time until June 16, 2025 for Phantom to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and for permission to exceed the word limit by 1,500 words for its memorandum of law in support of its intended motion to compel arbitrati . Document filed by Jeffrey Allton, Cassidy Hooper, Sara Jessica-Dilks, Traviis Massengale, Mark Miranda, James Morgan, Joy Morgan, Graham Murphy, Thomas Liam Murphy, Alex Perry, Trevor Perry, Walker Post, Gabrielle Reed, Charles Sustaita..(Murphy, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Demand Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Phantom's Response to Demand Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit Emails between Murphy and Morrison Cohen
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/21 11:18 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time until June 16, 2025 for Phantom to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and for permission to exceed the word limit by 1,500 words for its memorandum of law in support of its intended motion to compel arbitration and to dismiss addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Jason Gottlieb dated April 21, 2025. Document filed by Phantom Technologies, Inc...(Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/21 11:12 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Phantom Technologies, Inc...(Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emma Elizabeth McGrath on behalf of Phantom Technologies, Inc...(McGrath, Emma)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Cahen Isaacs on behalf of Phantom Technologies, Inc...(Isaacs, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason P. Gottlieb on behalf of Phantom Technologies, Inc...(Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/16 2:02 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phantom Technologies, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 7:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phantom Technologies, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jeffrey Allton, Cassidy Hooper, Sara Jessica-Dilks, Traviis Massengale, Mark Miranda, James Morgan, Joy Morgan, Graham Murphy, Thomas Liam Murphy, Alex Perry, Trevor Perry, Walker Post, Gabrielle Reed, Charles Sustaita..(Murphy, Thomas)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/15 9:59 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/15 9:59 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/15 10:00 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 04/15 10:00 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Liam Murphy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AUX CAYES FINTECH CO. LTD.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/14 2:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murphy, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 145 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT against AUX CAYES FINTECH CO. LTD., Phantom Technologies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30926237)Document filed by Sara Jessica-Dilks, Joy Morgan, Mark Miranda, Thomas Liam Murphy, Traviis Massengale, Trevor Perry, Gabrielle Reed, James Morgan, Cassidy Hooper, Jeffrey Allton, Graham Murphy, Alex Perry, Walker Post, Charles Sustaita..(Murphy, Thomas)
Related: [-]