Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02231

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:25-ap-00146
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Timothy Dalton Saylor
8000 Wheat Stone Dr
Zephyrhills, FL 33540
Represented By
Timothy Dalton Saylor
contact info
Defendant
Leland Wells Alston
14409 Hale Rd.
Dade City, FL 33523
Represented By
Leland Wells Alston
contact info
Defendant
Frank M Mendelsohn
7913 Outerbridge St.
Wesley Chapel, FL 33545
Represented By
Frank M Mendelsohn
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunshine Properties, LLC
2891 Center Pointe Dr. Suite 304
Fort Myers, FL 33901
Represented By
Brian D. Zinn
Zinnlaw PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 04/23 11:09 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Brian D. Zinn on behalf of Plaintiff Sunshine Properties, LLC. (Zinn, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 04/14 4:15 PM
Service Executed on Timothy Dalton Saylor, Leland Wells Alston, and Frank Mendelsohn of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Brian D. Zinn on behalf of Plaintiff Sunshine Properties, LLC. (Zinn, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/14 12:56 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/14/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deficient Filing (AP) Mon 04/14 11:55 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership Related [+]. Compliance required no later than 5/1/2025. (Penny)
Related: [-] 1
Saturday, April 12, 2025
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Sat 04/12 10:37 AM
Verified Complaint by Sunshine Properties, LLC against Timothy Dalton Saylor, Leland Wells Alston, Frank M Mendelsohn. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)],[65 (Dischargeability - other)],[14 Related [+]],[14]. (Zinn, Brian)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - othercovery of money/property - other