Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-54496

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:25-ap-02019
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jarrod Pickens
203 Balsam Drive
Pickerington, OH 43147
Represented By
Jarrod Pickens
contact info
Plaintiff
CFBank, National Association
4960 E. Dublin-Granville Road Suite 400
Columbus, OH 43081
Represented By
Daniel A Yarmesch
Kemp, Schaeffer & Rowe Co., L.P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 misc Summons Issued and Served Mon 04/14 11:29 AM
Summons(es) Issued and Served on CFBank, National Association on 4/11/2025, Answer due on 05/14/2025 (Yarmesch, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 misc Summons Issued Fri 04/11 1:54 PM
Summons Issued on Jarrod Pickens Date Issued 4/11/2025, Answer Due 05/12/2025 (Yarmesch, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/11 1:39 PM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-02019. (41(Objection /revocation of discharge 727 (c), (d), (e)): Complaint by CFBank, National Association against Jarrod Pickens. Fee Amount $350 (Yarmesch, Daniel) Modified nature of suit to conform with PDF on 4/14/2025 (ao).
Related: [-]