Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Case #: 2:25-cv-00659
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, County of Clark, A-25-914218-C
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 11:09 AM PDT
Defendant
American Family Insurance
Represented By
Lara L. Miller
Winner & Booze
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Peret


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 04/17 4:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christopher Peret. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McGaha, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 04/17 2:28 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant American Family Insurance. (Miller, Lara)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 04/17 2:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Family Insurance that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company, Other Affiliate PGC Holdings Corp., Other Affiliate New Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I., Other Affiliate American Family Insurance Dreams Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate American Family Insurance Dreams Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Networked Insights Inc., Other Affiliate Opterrix, Inc., Other Affiliate Am Fam Inc., Other Affiliate The Assure Start Insurance Agency, LLC, Other Affiliate Bowheard Insurance Holdings LP, Other Affiliate AmFam QOF, LLC, Other Affiliate Milwaukee AMBROZ, LLC, Other Affiliate Bold Penguin, Inc., Other Affiliate AFICS, Inc., Other Affiliate American Family Correct Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Other Affiliate American Standard Insurance Company of Ohio, Other Affiliate Homesite Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate Midvale Life Insurance Company of New York, Other Affiliate Am Fam Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Adjacency Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate American Family Insurance Institute for Corporate and Social Impact, Inc., Other Affiliate Moonrise Inc., Other Affiliate SHGI Corp., Other Affiliate American Family Brokerage, Inc., Other Affiliate American Familly Financial Services Inc., Other Affiliate American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc., Other Affiliate American Family Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Other Affiliate Main Street America Group Inc., Other Affiliate American Family Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Family Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Family Connect Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Family Connect Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Midvale Indemnity Company for American Family Insurance added. (Miller, Lara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 order Standing Order Tue 04/15 8:30 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Mon 04/14 4:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/14/2025. By Deputy Clerk: RJDG. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/29/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/14/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Mon 04/14 11:22 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by American Family Insurance. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/24/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/29/2025.(Miller, Lara)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Jury Demand Mon 04/14 11:19 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant American Family Insurance. (Miller, Lara)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Mon 04/14 10:38 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court - State of Nevada, Case Number A-25-914218-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-8018042) by American Family Insurance. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/24/2025. (Miller, Lara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix of Exhibits to Petition for Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Summons & Affidavit of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 04/14 4:17 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (RJDG)
Related: [-]