Sequoia v. Oconee County Animal Control et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Referred: | William S Brown |
Case #: | 8:25-cv-03144 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, 2025-CP-37-00190 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ryan King
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Oconee County Animal Control
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tonya Spalti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Sequoia
219 Highlands Hwy
Walhalla, SC 29691 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 04/18 10:19 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jacqueline Sequoia placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jacqueline Sequoia, 219 Highlands Hwy, Walhalla, SC 29691. (rweb, ) |
|
15 | 15
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 7 ) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 4/18/25. (rweb, ) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Response filed by Ryan King, Oconee County Animal Control, Tonya Spalti.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/24/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Smith, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2025 to correct attachment descriptions (rweb, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Document Mailed
Tue 04/15 1:11 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 10 Text Order,9 Initial Review Order and public docket sheet placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Jacqueline Sequoia, 219 Highlands Hwy, Walhalla, SC 29691. (rweb, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 04/15 1:10 PM
TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ECF No. 7 . The Court has reviewed that Motion. Nothing in the Motion or the record before the Court suggests the Court should consider the Motion for TRO ex parte. As such, Defendants are directed to file a response to the Motion within 10 days, after which the Court will issue a ruling. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 4/15/25. (rweb, ) |
|
9 | 9
![]() INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 4/15/25. (rweb, ) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jacqueline Sequoia. Response to Motion due by 4/28/2025. No proposed order.Motions referred to William S. Brown.(rweb, ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by Ryan King, Oconee County Animal Control, Tonya Spalti.(Smith, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ryan King, Oconee County Animal Control, Tonya Spalti.(rweb, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2025-CP 37-00190 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12386571), filed by Tonya Spalti, Ryan King, Oconee County Animal Control.(rweb, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |