Steward Health Care System LLC, et al., v. Micro-Tech Endoscopy USA Inc
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-90213
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-90213
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 4:25-ap-03222 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Micro-Tech Endoscopy USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steward Health Care System LLC, et al.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:11 PM CDT |
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7026 (Filed By Steward Health Care System LLC, et al., ). (Moore, Brian) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed on Micro-Tech Endoscopy USA Inc 4/18/2025. (Moore, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued on Micro-Tech Endoscopy USA Inc Date Issued 4/16/2025. (rlm4) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Request for Issuance of Summons on Micro-Tech Endoscopy USA Inc. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 25-03222 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint /Complaint to (I) Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfer(s) and (II) Disallow Claims (Attachment: Ex. A: Schedule of Transfers) by Steward Health Care System LLC, et al., against Micro-Tech Endoscopy USA Inc. Fee Amount $350 (Moore, Brian) |