Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-90213

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:25-ap-03285
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fagron Sterile Services LLC
Represented By
Fagron Sterile Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steward Health Care System LLC, et al.,
Represented By
Frank A. Oswald
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Brian Fintan Moore
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Kyle Ortiz
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/02 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
9 9 misc Affidavit Fri 05/02 2:33 PM
Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7026 (Filed By Steward Health Care System LLC, et al., ). (Ortiz, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/30 9:48 AM
Order Granting Motion for Conner B. Verreaux To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 4/30/2025. (yml4)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 04/30 9:46 AM
Order Granting Motion for D. Ethan Jeffery To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 4/30/2025. (yml4)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/29 10:36 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Conner B. Verreaux (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A26111670) Filed by Defendant Fagron Sterile Services LLC (Verreaux, Conner)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/29 10:33 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for D. Ethan Jeffery (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A26111624) Filed by Fagron Sterile Services LLC (Jeffery, Donald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/24 1:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fagron Sterile Services LLC 4/18/2025. (Ortiz, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 04/17 3:46 PM
Summons Issued on Fagron Sterile Services LLC Date Issued 4/17/2025. (rlm4)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 04/14 3:10 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Fagron Sterile Services LLC. (Ortiz, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 04/11 6:21 PM
Adversary case 25-03285 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint /Complaint to (I) Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfer(s) and (II) Disallow Claims (Attachment: Ex. A: Schedule of Transfers) by Steward Health Care System LLC, et al., against Fagron Sterile Services LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Moore, Brian)
Related: [-]