District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Beryl A Howell
Case #: 1:25-cv-01114
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
NATIONAL CABLE SATELLITE CORPORATION
Lead Plaintiffs
MATTHEW HORAN
Lead Plaintiffs
JOHN SULLIVAN


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 order .Order Tue 04/15 7:15 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 15, 2025. (lcbah4)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 04/14 4:15 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL CABLE SATELLITE CORPORATION.(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CABLE SATELLITE CORPORATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11613773) filed by MATTHEW HORAN, JOHN SULLIVAN.(Doerrer, Stan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/14/2025) (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/14 4:13 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmtm)
Related: [-]