Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-00191

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Benjamin P Hursh
Case #: 1:25-ap-06016
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tyler Hess
23536 Canyon Lane
Caldwell, ID 83607
Represented By
Tyler Hess
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy R. Kurtz
P.O. Box 956
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Lauren Bouvia
Johnson May
contact info
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/18 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Tyler Hess 4/18/2025 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 04/18 10:09 AM
Summons Issued on Tyler Hess Date Issued 4/18/2025, Answer Due 5/19/2025 (ck)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 04/18 8:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-06016 BPH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8573442. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Tue 04/15 11:10 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 10:13 AM
Adversary case 25-06016 14 Related [+]: Complaint by Timothy R. Kurtz against Tyler Hess. Fee Amount $350 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adv Coversheet
Att: 2 Summons