Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Case #: 3:25-cv-00593
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:06 PM EDT
Defendant
TOWN OF EAST HARTFORD CT
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY ALLBEE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN ALLEN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
SHANE ANDERSON
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID ARBURR
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN AVERY
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
HUNTER BARNES
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CLIFFORD BARTISS
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
WESLEY BELL
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT BIDWELL
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KYLE BOUCHARD
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ALEXANDER BOWYER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW BRAUNSHWEIGER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID BREINER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ZACHARY BROWN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JACOB BRUNGARD
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER BURDICK
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN BURRELLE, JR
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS CALSETTA
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
COREY CEPELAK
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CONNAR CHICOSKI
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
TREVON CHIN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
E. WILLIAM CINK
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL CLYNCH
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS COBB
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERTO COLON
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH COTICHI-IRIZARRY
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS CREAVEN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DELL'AGNESE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY DEMAREST
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS DEMPSEY
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DESILET
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER DEVINE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
SALVATORE DICELLO
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT DRAGHI
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD FANKHANEL
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY FAZZINO
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT FIGORAS
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JACK FLANAGAN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW FLOR
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL FORAN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL FRACZEK
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER FRASER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY GEORGE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW GILMAN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER GOGLIA
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN GOODWIN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN GUNNOUD
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW HANNON
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DARREL HANRAHAN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
RONALD HUBER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT JUNE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL KALUTA
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN KINELL
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWN KINKADE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN KOKOSZKA
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL LACKMAN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY LAMBERT
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON LAPOINTE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD LEACH
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL MACDONALD
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
HENRY MAILHOT, II
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW MALONE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CLINTON MARTH
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ERICH MARTIN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
COLLIN MAYNARD
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DEVIN MCDERMOTT
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT MCDONALD
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENNAN MCGUIRE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS MEHL
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM MELENDEZ
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KYLE MILTIMORE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
RAUL MONTES
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
GERARD NEGRETTI
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID NOYES
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DOMINIC PASCUCCI
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN PELOW
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN PETERSON
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY QUINN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC RAMSAY
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN REARDON
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN REITMEYER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MARCUS RICE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK RICHARDS
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN RING, JR
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CONNER RUDEWICZ
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN RUDMAN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
RAYMOND SANCHEZ
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN SARLES
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
BRADFORD SAWICKI
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN SCHIESSL
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL SENERTH
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
SPENCER SHIRSHAC
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
DANIEL SLOMCINSKY
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES SOPELAK
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW STRUBLE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY TAYLOR
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
ERIC THEPSIRI
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT THOMPSON
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
CONOR THOMSEN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JONATHAN TORRES
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL TRANSUE
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JUSTIN URIAN
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
AARON VIRKLER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN WALL
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
JARED WEINER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
KAYNE WELLAUER
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
SCOTT WOODS
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info
Plaintiff
TYLER YOUNG
Represented By
James Nicholas Demetriades
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/13 9:07 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the Town of East Hartford, Connecticut's motion for extension of time to respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint until July 15, 2025 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/13/2025. (McCowan, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 05/12 2:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until July 15, 2025 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Town of East Hartford. (Kallor, Robin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy M. Cieslak on behalf of Town of East Hartford (Cieslak, Cindy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robin B. Kallor on behalf of Town of East Hartford (Kallor, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Tue 05/06 11:31 AM
First AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons. Complaint, Cover Sheet and attachments served on Town Clerk, Town of East Hartford, CT on 04/25/2025, filed by Timothy Allbee, Jonathan Allen, Shane Anderson, David Arburr, John Avery, Hunter Barnes, Clifford Bartiss, Wesley Bell, Robert Bidwell, Kyle Bouchard, Alexander Bowyer, Matthew Braunshweiger, David Breiner, Zachary Brown, Jacob Brungard, Christopher Burdick, John Burrelle, Jr, Nicholas Calsetta, Corey Cepelak, Connar Chicoski, Trevon Chin, E. WIlliam Cink, Michael Clynch, Thomas Cobb, Roberto Colon, Kenneth Corichi-Irizarry, Nicholas Creaven, Michael Dell'Agnese, Jeffrey Demarest, Thomas Dempsey, Michael Desilet, Christopher Devine, Salvatore Dicello, Robert Draghi, Richard Fankhanel, Anthony Fazzino, Robert Figoras, Jack Flanagan, Matthew Flor, Daniel Foran, Daniel Fraczek, Christ Fraser, Timothy George, Matthew Gilman, Christopher Goglia, Kevin Goodwin, Brian Gunnoud, Matthew Hannon, Darrel Hanrahan, Ronald Huber, Robert June, Michael Kaluta, John Kinell, Shawn Kinkade, Kevin Kokoszka, Michael Lackman, Timothy Lambert, Aaron Lapointe, Richard Leach, Daniel MacDonald, Henry Mailhot, II, Andrew Malone, Clinton Marth, Erich Martin, Collin Maynard, Devin McDermott, Robert McDonald, Brennan McGuire, Thomas Mehl, William Melendez, Kyle Miltimore, Raul Montes, Gerard Negretti, David Noyes, Dominic Pascucci, John Pelow, Ryan Peterson, Jeffrey Quinn, Eric Ramsey, Ryan Reardon, John Reitmeyer, Marcus Rice, Patrick Richards, Kevin Ring, Jr, Conner Rudewicz, John Rudman, Raymond Sanchez, John Sarles, Bradford Sawicki, Jonathan Schiessl, Michael Senerth, Spencer Shirshac, Daniel Slomcinsky, James Sopelak, Matthew Struble, Timothy Taylor, Eric Thepsiri, Scott Thompson, Conor Thomsen, Jonathan Torres, Michael Transue, Justin Urian, Aaron Virkler, Kevin Wall, Jared Weiner, Kayne Wellauer, Scott Woods, Tyler Young. (Demetriades, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 04/16 10:50 AM
Disclosure Statement by Timothy Allbee, Jonathan Allen, Shane Anderson, David Arburr, John Avery, Hunter Barnes, Clifford Bartiss, Wesley Bell, Robert Bidwell, Kyle Bouchard, Alexander Bowyer, Matthew Braunshweiger, David Breiner, Zachary Brown, Jacob Brungard, Christopher Burdick, John Burrelle, Jr, Nicholas Calsetta, Corey Cepelak, Connar Chicoski, Trevon Chin, E. WIlliam Cink, Michael Clynch, Thomas Cobb, Roberto Colon, Kenneth Corichi-Irizarry, Nicholas Creaven, Michael Dell'Agnese, Jeffrey Demarest, Thomas Dempsey, Michael Desilet, Christopher Devine, Salvatore Dicello, Robert Draghi, Richard Fankhanel, Anthony Fazzino, Robert Figoras, Jack Flanagan, Matthew Flor, Daniel Foran, Daniel Fraczek, Christ Fraser, Timothy George, Matthew Gilman, Christopher Goglia, Kevin Goodwin, Brian Gunnoud, Matthew Hannon, Darrel Hanrahan, Ronald Huber, Robert June, Michael Kaluta, John Kinell, Shawn Kinkade, Kevin Kokoszka, Michael Lackman, Timothy Lambert, Aaron Lapointe, Richard Leach, Daniel MacDonald, Henry Mailhot, II, Andrew Malone, Clinton Marth, Erich Martin, Collin Maynard, Devin McDermott, Robert McDonald, Brennan McGuire, Thomas Mehl, William Melendez, Kyle Miltimore, Raul Montes, Gerard Negretti, David Noyes, Dominic Pascucci, John Pelow, Ryan Peterson, Jeffrey Quinn, Eric Ramsey, Ryan Reardon, John Reitmeyer, Marcus Rice, Patrick Richards, Kevin Ring, Jr, Conner Rudewicz, John Rudman, Raymond Sanchez, John Sarles, Bradford Sawicki, Jonathan Schiessl, Michael Senerth, Spencer Shirshac, Daniel Slomcinsky, James Sopelak, Matthew Struble, Timothy Taylor, Eric Thepsiri, Scott Thompson, Conor Thomsen, Jonathan Torres, Michael Transue, Justin Urian, Aaron Virkler, Kevin Wall, Jared Weiner, Kayne Wellauer, Scott Woods, Tyler Young. (Demetriades, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/15 9:52 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to * All Defendants * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Nicholas Demetriades* *272 Skyview Dr.* *Cromwell, CT 06416*. (Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 04/15 9:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,1 Complaint,,,,,,, filed by JOHN REITMEYER, DAVID NOYES, KYLE MILTIMORE, Christ Fraser, JARED WEINER, KEVIN RING, JR, RAUL MONTES, KAYNE WELLAUER, ERIC RAMSAY, DANIEL SLOMCINSKY, Michael Clynch, MICHAEL SENERTH, Thomas Cobb, Matthew Braunshweiger, BRENNAN MCGUIRE, ROBERT MCDONALD, Anthony Fazzino, Richard Fankhanel, THOMAS MEHL, CONOR THOMSEN, TIMOTHY TAYLOR, MICHAEL TRANSUE, Shawn Kinkade, Thomas Dempsey, Robert Bidwell, Clifford Bartiss, DANIEL MACDONALD, Darrel Hanrahan, Jacob Brungard, RYAN REARDON, PATRICK RICHARDS, Christopher Goglia, RICHARD LEACH, ERIC THEPSIRI, MICHAEL LACKMAN, Daniel Fraczek, Wesley Bell, Daniel Foran, John Burrelle, Jr, Jack Flanagan, Roberto Colon, JUSTIN URIAN, David Arburr, JOHN PELOW, Michael Kaluta, Corey Cepelak, AARON VIRKLER, CONNER RUDEWICZ, Alexander Bowyer, Jeffrey Demarest, RAYMOND SANCHEZ, Timothy Allbee, Trevon Chin, RYAN PETERSON, Christopher Burdick, Robert Figoras, SCOTT THOMPSON, Zachary Brown, CLINTON MARTH, JOHN RUDMAN, Kevin Goodwin, Matthew Hannon, KEVIN KOKOSZKA, David Breiner, JEFFREY QUINN, John Kinell, Kyle Bouchard, BRADFORD SAWICKI, Connar Chicoski, Christopher Devine, Kenneth Corichi-Irizarry, ERICH MARTIN, Matthew Gilman, JAMES SOPELAK, AARON LAPOINTE, Michael Dell'Agnese, ANDREW MALONE, GERARD NEGRETTI, DEVIN MCDERMOTT, TIMOTHY LAMBERT, Jonathan Allen, DOMINIC PASCUCCI, JONATHAN TORRES, SPENCER SHIRSHAC, COLLIN MAYNARD, E. WIlliam Cink, Nicholas Calsetta, Hunter Barnes, Salvatore Dicello, TYLER YOUNG, MATTHEW STRUBLE, MARCUS RICE, KEVIN WALL, Matthew Flor, JOHN SARLES, Nicholas Creaven, WILLIAM MELENDEZ, John Avery, Brian Gunnoud, Robert June, Shane Anderson, HENRY MAILHOT, II, SCOTT WOODS, Timothy George, JONATHAN SCHIESSL, Michael Desilet, Robert Draghi, Ronald Huber,4 Electronic Filing Order,7 Standing Order for FLSA cases,5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2025.(Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 intord Standing Order for FLSA cases Tue 04/15 9:48 AM
Standing Order for Fair Labor Standards Act cases not pleaded as a class or collective action. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/14/2025.(Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Tue 04/15 9:46 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Tue 04/15 9:45 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/14/2025.(Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 04/15 9:44 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/14/2025.(Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 04/15 9:43 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2025 Discovery due by 10/14/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2025 Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2025.(Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 9:09 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2025.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against TOWN OF EAST HARTFORD CT ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8135120.), filed by SALVATORE DICELLO, CHRISTOPHER DEVINE, JONATHAN SCHIESSL, CLINTON MARTH, TREVON CHIN, KYLE MILTIMORE, JUSTIN URIAN, CLIFFORD BARTISS, RYAN REARDON, KENNETH COTICHI-IRIZARRY, CONOR THOMSEN, NICHOLAS CALSETTA, RAUL MONTES, CHRISTOPHER BURDICK, MATTHEW GILMAN, KEVIN KOKOSZKA, KEVIN RING, JR, DAVID NOYES, NICHOLAS CREAVEN, MATTHEW STRUBLE, TIMOTHY LAMBERT, HENRY MAILHOT, II, TYLER YOUNG, CONNAR CHICOSKI, SPENCER SHIRSHAC, AARON VIRKLER, BRADFORD SAWICKI, KYLE BOUCHARD, MICHAEL DESILET, RICHARD FANKHANEL, ALEXANDER BOWYER, MICHAEL SENERTH, JEFFREY QUINN, SCOTT WOODS, MATTHEW HANNON, RAYMOND SANCHEZ, DANIEL SLOMCINSKY, RYAN PETERSON, KAYNE WELLAUER, COLLIN MAYNARD, JEFFREY DEMAREST, RONALD HUBER, MATTHEW FLOR, ERICH MARTIN, ERIC THEPSIRI, AARON LAPOINTE, DANIEL FRACZEK, MATTHEW BRAUNSHWEIGER, JACOB BRUNGARD, JOHN REITMEYER, MICHAEL KALUTA, DANIEL MACDONALD, MICHAEL LACKMAN, MICHAEL TRANSUE, GERARD NEGRETTI, DEVIN MCDERMOTT, CHRISTOPHER GOGLIA, JOHN RUDMAN, JOHN PELOW, COREY CEPELAK, ANDREW MALONE, SHAWN KINKADE, ROBERT MCDONALD, WILLIAM MELENDEZ, BRENNAN MCGUIRE, JONATHAN ALLEN, JOHN BURRELLE, JR, TIMOTHY ALLBEE, JOHN SARLES, THOMAS DEMPSEY, JONATHAN TORRES, MARCUS RICE, ROBERTO COLON, MICHAEL DELL'AGNESE, PATRICK RICHARDS, DOMINIC PASCUCCI, DANIEL FORAN, ZACHARY BROWN, THOMAS MEHL, RICHARD LEACH, DARREL HANRAHAN, THOMAS COBB, KEVIN WALL, JOHN KINELL, ERIC RAMSAY, E. WILLIAM CINK, CHRISTOPHER FRASER, KEVIN GOODWIN, MICHAEL CLYNCH, DAVID BREINER, JARED WEINER, TIMOTHY TAYLOR, HUNTER BARNES, CONNER RUDEWICZ, SHANE ANDERSON, ANTHONY FAZZINO, JAMES SOPELAK, ROBERT BIDWELL, ROBERT JUNE, BRIAN GUNNOUD, WESLEY BELL, JACK FLANAGAN, SCOTT THOMPSON, DAVID ARBURR, ROBERT DRAGHI, ROBERT FIGORAS, TIMOTHY GEORGE, JOHN AVERY.(Demetriades, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B
service Request to Issue Summons Mon 04/14 3:45 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Demetriades, James)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Tue 04/15 9:18 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Victor A. Bolden assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]