Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:25-cv-11070
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Pangeo Corporation
Plaintiff
JAC Products, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph J. Shannon, III
Bodman
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
8 8 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 05/14 3:11 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by JAC Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JAC Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate JAC Holding Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate JAC Brazi Participacaoes LTDA, Other Affiliate JAC PRODUCTS Mexico, S. DE R.L. DE C.V., Other Affiliate JAC Mexico, LLC, Other Affiliate JAC Products Netherlands B.V, Other Affiliate Franklin Aluminum Company, Other Affiliate JAC Auto Parts (Ningbo) Co., Other Affiliate APE III (JAC), Inc., Other Affiliate HCP JAC, LLC, Other Affiliate Argonaut Private Equity Fund III AIV, LP, Other Affiliate Argonaut Private Equity Fund III, LP, Other Affiliate ARG Private Equity II, LLC for JAC Products, Inc.. (Shannon, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appear* Wed 05/14 10:48 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion . Please see notice for call information. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
6 6 cmp Civil Case - Counterclaim Tue 05/13 11:03 PM
COUNTERCLAIM filed by Pangeo Corporation against JAC Products, Inc. (Murkowski, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/13 10:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Pangeo Corporation. (Murkowski, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/15 11:44 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Pangeo Corporation served on 4/15/2025, answer due 5/6/2025. (Shannon, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Tue 04/15 8:49 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Pangeo Corporation* (LHam)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 04/15 8:49 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LHam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/14 4:36 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by JAC Products, Inc.. (Shannon, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- JAC Terms & Conditions,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Term Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - 03/13/2025 - Letter from Pangeo to JAC,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - 04/02/25 - Email from JAC to Pangeo,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - 04/09/2025 Letter from Pangeo to JAC,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - 04/10/2025 Email from JAC to Pangeo,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Lear Corp. v. Dura Auto. Sys., 2006 No. 06-075939-CZ, 2006 Mich. Cir. LEXIS 1607 at *8 (Cir. Ct. Oakland Cty. Aug 11, 2006),
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - 9Cafe Cola, Inc. v. Somojo, Inc., Civ.A. No. 96-562, 1996 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 3207 *25-26 (E.D. La. 1996),
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Nexteer Automotive Corp., v. Primax Corp., No. 2:2025-cv-11035 (E.D. Mich. April 10, 2025),
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - TeamQuest Corp. v. Unisys Corp., No. C97-3049, 2000 WL 34031793, *13 (N.D. Iowa, April 20, 2000),
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - AK Steel Corp. v. Colton, No. 01-74279 2001 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 20314 (E.D. Mich. Dec 3, 2001),
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Key Safety Sys. v. Invista, S.A.R.L., L.L.C., No. 08-CV-10558, 2008 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 70117, *37 (E.D. Mich. Sep. 16, 2008),
Att: 15 Exhibit 14Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause
1 1 15 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 04/14 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Injunctive and Other Relief filed by JAC Products, Inc. against Pangeo Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10196537 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Shannon, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - JAC Terms & Conditions,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Term Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - 03/13/2025 Letter from Pangeo to JAC,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - 04/02/2025 Email from JAC to Pangeo,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - 04/09/2025 Letter from Pangeo to JAC,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - 04/10/2025 Email from JAC to Pangeo