New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Case #: 1:25-cv-03072
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Russell T. Vought
Defendant
United States Office of Management and Budget
Defendant
Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service
Defendant
Gregory Goldstein
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
United States Attorney's Office Southern District of New York 86 Chambers Street
New York, NY 10007
Plaintiff
SEIU Healthcare Minnesota & Iowa
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
United Nurses Associations of California/Union of Health Care Professionals
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
United Federation of Teachers
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
UFCW Local 135
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Service Employees International Union, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
SEIU Committee of Interns and Residents
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
IAM District 160
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
American Federation of State, County & Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Represented By
Elisabeth Oppenheimer
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
59 59 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 05/16 2:10 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Sine Die addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Rebecca Salk dated 5/16/2025. Document filed by Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service, Gregory Goldstein, United States Office of Management and Budget, United States of America, Russell T. Vought..(Salk, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
58 58 misc Letter Fri 05/16 1:16 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Elisabeth Oppenheimer dated May 16, 2025 re: responding to Court Order ECF No. 56. Document filed by AFSCME Council 31, American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, American Federation of State, County & Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, IAM District 160, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO, SEIU Committee of Interns and Residents, SEIU Healthcare Minnesota & Iowa, Service Employees International Union, AFL-CIO, UFCW Local 135, UFCW Local 2013, United Federation of Teachers, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, United Nurses Associations of California/Union of Health Care Professionals..(Oppenheimer, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
57 57 misc Letter Wed 05/14 3:21 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Rebecca Salk dated 5/14/2025 re: Court's Order Dated 4/15/25 (ECF No. 7). Document filed by Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service, Gregory Goldstein, United States Office of Management and Budget, United States of America, Russell T. Vought..(Salk, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
56 56 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/14 12:42 PM
ORDER: On Tuesday, May 13, 2025, the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island entered a preliminary injunction that furnishes the relief plaintiffs in this case seek on their pending motion for injunctive relief. See Dkt. 53-1; Dkt. 9. Meanwhile, the Court has expedited the discovery schedule in this case, which means that plaintiffs will have the administrative record by May 27, 2025, see Dkt. 54, and the Court will set a summary-judgment briefing schedule that should have this case ready for a final decision within months. In light of these developments, plaintiffs are hereby ordered to inform the Court by Friday, May 16, 2025, if there is any reason why the Court should not deny as moot the plaintiffs' motion, without prejudice to the renewal of the motion (without the need to submit further materials) if circumstances change. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/14/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
55 55 order Memo Endorsement Wed 05/14 12:39 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:54 Letter, filed by United States Office of Management and Budget, Russell T. Vought, Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service, Gregory Goldstein, United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 54. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 5/14/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
54 54 misc Letter Tue 05/13 5:40 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Lawrence H. Fogelman dated May 13, 2025 re: request for a 12-day extension of the date by which to produce to Plaintiffs and file the administrative record, from May 15, 2025, to May 27, 2025. Document filed by Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service, Gregory Goldstein, United States Office of Management and Budget, United States of America, Russell T. Vought..(Fogelman, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
53 53 misc Letter Tue 05/13 3:59 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Arun Subramanian from Rebecca L. Salk dated 5/13/2025 re: Order Issuing Preliminary Injunction in District of Rhode Island. Document filed by Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service, Gregory Goldstein, United States Office of Management and Budget, United States of America, Russell T. Vought..(Salk, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - District of Rhode Island PI Order
52 52 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Lynn Salk on behalf of Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service, Gregory Goldstein, United States Office of Management and Budget, United States of America, Russell T. Vought..(Salk, Rebecca)
Related: [-]