Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:25-cv-00923
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court for the 10th Judicial Circuit, 2025ca000775000000
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:07 PM EDT
Defendant
American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By
Michaela D. Scheihing
Southeast Law Group, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Angel Santiago Garcia


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/08 2:35 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(Scheihing, Michaela)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 04/21 3:34 PM
HURRICANE CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/21/2025. (SRC)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Protective Order Mon 04/21 3:32 PM
HURRICANE INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/21/2025. (SRC)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Mon 04/21 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Plaintiffs Appearance by Craig D. Rolle on behalf of Luis Angel Santiago Garcia (Rolle, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 04/18 7:43 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michaela D. Scheihing on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Lead Counsel: Michaela Scheihing. (Scheihing, Michaela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/16 12:50 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL All counsel of record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/15 2:40 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:25-cv-00923-TPB-AAS. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/14 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation (NYSE: PGR) for American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Scheihing, Michaela)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Condemnation Notice of Removal Mon 04/14 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 10th Judicial Circuit for Polk County, case number 2025CA000775000000 filed in State Court on 3/6/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23243557 filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp..(Scheihing, Michaela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process,
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice of Intent with estimates,
Att: 5 Exhibit Response to Notice of Intent,
Att: 6 Exhibit Homestead Exemption,
Att: 7 Exhibit Defendant domicile,
Att: 8 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 9 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet