Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:25-cv-21707
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 6:04 PM EDT
Defendant
L'Occitane, Inc.
1201 HAYS STREET
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Plaintiff
Yudy Hernandez
P.O. Box 228630
Miami, FL 33222
Represented By
Richard John Adams, Jr.
Adams & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Administrative Order Mon 05/05 12:57 PM
ORDER on5 Notice of Settlement; Parties Notice of Dismissal or Stipulation of Dismissal due 7/1/2025; Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/5/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 05/02 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Yudy Hernandez. Attorney Diego German Mendez added to party Yudy Hernandez(pty:pla). (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 04/21 9:44 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yudy Hernandez. L'Occitane, Inc. served on 4/18/2025, response/answer due 5/9/2025. (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 7:53 AM
Summons Issued as to L'Occitane, Inc.. (ksr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 04/15 7:50 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ksr)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 5:13 PM
COMPLAINT against L'Occitane, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18366212, filed by Yudy Hernandez.(Adams, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)