Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00419
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Hardee's Restaurants, LLC
Plaintiff
Paradigm Investment Group, LLC
Represented By
J. Brad Scarbrough
Buildlaw, PLC
contact info
Gregory H. Oakley
Buildlaw, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/29 2:10 PM
ORDER granting21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Hardee's Restaurants, LLC answer due 6/6/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/29/2025. (ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/28 3:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Hardee's Restaurants, LLC. (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 4:18 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' "Joint Notice Regarding Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order Application" (Doc. No.19 , "Notice"). The Court advises the parties that in light of the substance of the Notice, it will take no action on the pending motion (Doc. No.6 ) until it receives an update from the parties. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/17/2025. (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/16 2:59 PM
NOTICE by Hardee's Restaurants, LLC (JOINT) RE: PLAINTIFF'S TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER APPLICATION (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Wed 04/16 9:32 AM
Summons issued as to Hardee's Restaurants, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/16 8:23 AM
ORDER: I hereby recuse myself from this action. The hearing scheduled for April 16, 2025 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/15/2025. (mg)
Related: [-]
16 16 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Tue 04/15 5:45 PM
ORDER: I hereby recuse myself from this action. The hearing scheduled for April 16, 2025 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 04/15/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of Hardee's Restaurants, LLC (Harvey, Robb)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Williamson on behalf of Hardee's Restaurants, LLC (Williamson, Charles)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Supplement Tue 04/15 10:42 AM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC re10 Business Entity Disclosure Statement. (Oakley, Gregory)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 10:02 AM
ORDER: The Business Entity Disclosure (Doc. No.10 ) filed by Plaintiff Paradigm Investment Group, LLC is limited to Plaintiff. This is not sufficient to establish diversity of citizenship under 18 U.S.C. §1332. (Doc. No.1 at 2.) Plaintiff must also submit a Business Entity form for Defendant Hardee's Restaurants, LLC that states the residence of each member of the limited partnership. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. The Plaintiff shall file supplemental Business Entity forms no later than 5:00 p.m. on April 15, 2025, so that the Court can confirm subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/15/2025. (mg)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Tue 04/15 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Hardee's Restaurants, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Oakley, Gregory)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 8:53 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC. (Oakley, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Tue 04/15 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC re1 Complaint,,,,,(Oakley, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Executed Verification to Complaint
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 order Temporary Restraining Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/14 8:57 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No.6 ) under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. Based on the allegations in Plaintiff's motion and what purports to be the "Verified Complaint" (Doc. No.1 ), the Court will hold a hearing on the motion on April 16, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. The parties SHALL MAINTAIN THE STATUS QUO pending the hearing. Plaintiff shall immediately serve Defendants with a copy of this Order, at which time this Order becomes effective. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr. on 04/14/2025. (Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5D before District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr.). (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 respoth Brief (non-appeal) Mon 04/14 4:27 PM
BRIEF filed by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC re6 Motion for TRO. (Oakley, Gregory)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/14 4:26 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC.(Oakley, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 04 14 25 email,
Att: 2 Attachment Proposed TRO
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 04/14 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 6/18/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 04/14 4:13 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 04/14 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 04/14 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Hardee's Restaurants, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4301108), filed by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 2024 FTC Staff Guidance,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 2003 Master Franchise Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 2021 Franchise Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 2025 Operations and Procedures Manual,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 3-17-23 Condos Memo,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 5-4-23 Wetzel Memo,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 9-31-23 Wetzel Memo,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 Guith Memo,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 Notice of Default,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Response to Notice of Default,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 Reply re Notice of Default,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 CKE Email re NOD,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 CKE June 2022 non-compliance letter,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 Status Certificate,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 2020 FDD.,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 June 2021 Tech Memo,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 2024 FDD,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 Appendix A to 2024 Franchise Agreement,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 Memo re GTech Fee,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 2 for $0 promotion,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 Email re operation hours changes,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 ILumen Report,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 Non-Modified Stores March 2025,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 Modified Stores March 2025,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 Hartsell Example,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 Unit Economics email,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 Hardees Expres,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 Balance Scorecard,
Att: 29 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 04/14 4:14 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory H. Oakley, J. Brad Scarbrough admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]