Member Case
Lead case is: 4:25-bk-40162

Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 4:25-bk-40161
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Consolidated Burger B, LLC
2729 Fort Knox Blvd Ste 1300
Tallahassee, FL 32308-6261
Represented By
Paul Steven Singerman
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Jason H. Egan
Office Of The U. S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
20 20 misc Equity Security Holders Mon 04/28 9:48 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Christopher A Jarvinen on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC. (Jarvinen, Christopher)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Declaration Mon 04/28 8:38 PM
Declaration re: Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Jordi Guso on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC [Re:18 Summary of Assets & Liabilities, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs]. (Guso, Jordi)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Schedule A/B - Real & Personal Property Mon 04/28 8:37 PM
Summary of Assets & Liabilities , Schedule A/B: Property , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H and , Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Jordi Guso on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC. (Guso, Jordi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/18 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies.
16 16 misc Case Management Summary Thu 04/17 10:17 AM
Case Management Summary (Consolidated) Filed by Christopher A Jarvinen on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC. (Jarvinen, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
341info 341 Meeting Info for Ch 11 or 12 or Case Converted to Ch 7 (OUST Only) Wed 04/16 11:12 AM
Trustee's Memo re 341 Meeting: Please schedule Meeting of Creditors to be held at 10:00 AM (EST) on May 19, 2025 in BY TELEPHONE Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
15 15 court Clerk's Notice to Parties (PDF or NEF) Tue 04/15 4:02 PM
Notice: An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of Consolidated Burger Holdings, LLC, Case No. 25-40162 KKS; Consolidated Burger A, LLC, Case No. 25-40160 KKS; and Consolidated Burger B, LLC, Case No. 25-40161 KKS. The Docket in Case No. 25-40162 KKS (Consolidated Burger Holdings, LLC) should be consulted for all matters affecting the jointly administered cases and all future papers and pleadings shall be filed and docketed therein. Related [+] Service by Notice of Electronic Filing. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion for Joint Administration.
14 14 6 pgs order Order re Motion for Joint Administration (PDF) Tue 04/15 4:01 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 4:25-bk-40162 with Member Case(s) 4:25-bk-40161, 4:25-bk-40160 Related [+] signed on 4/15/2025 . SERVICE: Attorney Paul Singerman shall serve this document pursuant to the applicable Rules and file a certificate of service within three (3) days. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 7
13 13 court Notice to Cure Petition Deficiencies (Form/PDF) Tue 04/15 3:51 PM
Notice of Deadline to Cure Deficiencies. A complete list of deficient items due from Debtors attached. Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 utility Corrective Entry w/Checklist Tue 04/15 3:49 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY BY CASE ADMINISTRATOR - The entry referenced hereto has been modified by the court for accuracy: Address - Debtor address changed in ECF to match Petition. Related [+] (Thurman, Audrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11).
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Tue 04/15 1:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Conor McLaughlin on behalf of United States Trustee. (McLaughlin, Conor)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Tue 04/15 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Adisley Cortez-Rodriguez on behalf of United States Trustee. (Cortez-Rodriguez, Adisley)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 04/15 10:52 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Jordi Guso on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC. (Guso, Jordi)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Mailing Matrix - Verified (Restricted Use) Tue 04/15 9:58 AM
Verified Mailing Matrix Filed by Christopher A Jarvinen on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC. (Jarvinen, Christopher)
Related: [-]
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Tue 04/15 6:00 AM
Case assigned to Carolyn Romine (admin)
Related: [-]
court 5Alpha Case Admin Assignment (NoDoc) Tue 04/15 3:50 PM
Case reassigned to Jestin Hawkins (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 motion Motion for Joint Administration Mon 04/14 7:30 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/14 7:29 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC [Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Mon 04/14 7:28 PM
Declaration re: Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC [Re:4 List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against Debtor(s) and Are Not Insiders]. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Mon 04/14 7:27 PM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against Debtor(s) and Are Not Insiders (Consolidated List of Creditors Who Have the 30 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders) Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Consolidated Burger B, LLC [Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance (Appearance of Attorney) Mon 04/14 5:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason H. Egan on behalf of United States Trustee. (Egan, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Mon 04/14 4:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-40161 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5511650, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/14 4:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) (Filing Fee: $1738.00) filed by Consolidated Burger B, LLC. List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 04/28/2025. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/28/2025. BPP Disclosure of Compensation due 04/28/2025. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature due 04/28/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement due 04/28/2025. Credit Counseling Certificate due 04/28/2025. Employee Income Record or Statement of No Employee Income due: 04/28/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 04/28/2025. List of Creditors/Matrix due immediately. Schedule A/B due 04/28/2025. Schedule C due 04/28/2025. Schedule D due 04/28/2025. Schedule E/F due 04/28/2025. Schedule G due 04/28/2025. Schedule H due 04/28/2025. Schedule I due 04/28/2025. Schedule J due 04/28/2025. Schedule J-2 due 04/28/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/28/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/28/2025. Ch 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income (122B) due 04/28/2025. Statement of Social Security or Tax ID Number due 04/28/2025. Petition Filing Fee from Prior Case due 04/28/2025. Petition Filing Fee due 04/28/2025. Deadline to Cure Deficiency(ies): 04/28/2025 . (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
utility Add Judge (NoDoc) Mon 04/14 9:22 PM
Case assigned to Judge Karen K. Specie (Gibson, Julie)
Related: [-]