Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Referred: N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:25-cv-01179
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:08 PM MDT
Defendant
U.S. Nursing Corporation
Plaintiff
Yahaira Alvarez
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tayzia Lowenstein
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Monique Lyttle
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jazalene Marshall
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Latrice Odom
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vicki Patterson
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mayah Perkins-Wilson
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Preston
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Junior Prophete
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernesto Quintero
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Keisha Richey
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dina Smith
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Refugio Villasenor
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tara Walburger
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rikki Williams
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lori Woodford
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Beverly Dilbeck
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Anderson
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ayonna Brown
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tera Clay
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lachristy Colbert
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn Ann Cooper
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Corporon
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Decatur
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Denby
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse Lewis
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Destiny Dumas
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Laschelle Featherston-Olson
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Ford
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Latasha Hamilton
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Crystal Jules
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aisha King
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaslyn Lanclos
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jahmelia Lewis
Represented By
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 04/29 2:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. U.S. Nursing Corporation served on 4/29/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Johnston, Rod)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 04/23 1:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/23/2025, re:8 plaintiffs' Notice of Related Case. ORDERED that, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), Civil Action No. 25-cv-01179-PAB-NRN is REASSIGNED to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Future filings in these actions shall be docketed under case number 25-cv-01179-RMR-NRN . (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/15 6:57 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiffs Beverly Dilbeck, Destiny Dumas, Laschelle Featherston-Olson, Christian Ford, Latasha Hamilton, Crystal Jules, Aisha King, Jaslyn Lanclos, Jahmelia Lewis, Jesse Lewis, Yahaira Alvarez, Tayzia Lowenstein, Monique Lyttle, Jazalene Marshall, Latrice Odom, Vicki Patterson, Mayah Perkins-Wilson, Sharon Preston, Junior Prophete, Ernesto Quintero, Keisha Richey, Kayla Anderson, Dina Smith, Refugio Villasenor, Tara Walburger, Rikki Williams, Lori Woodford, Ayonna Brown, Tera Clay, Lachristy Colbert, Lynn Ann Cooper, Donna Corporon, Katherine Decatur, Tiffany Denby (Johnston, Rod)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/15 9:39 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/8/2025. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/15/2025. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/15 8:55 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/15/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Administrative Notice Tue 04/15 8:13 AM
Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (echa, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Tue 04/15 8:08 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (echa, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 04/15 8:07 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 04/15 8:07 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against U.S. Nursing Corporation (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10277022)Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Beverly Dilbeck(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Destiny Dumas(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Laschelle Featherston-Olson(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Christian Ford(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Latasha Hamilton(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Crystal Jules(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Aisha King(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Jaslyn Lanclos(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Jahmelia Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Jesse Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Yahaira Alvarez(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Tayzia Lowenstein(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Monique Lyttle(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Jazalene Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Latrice Odom(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Vicki Patterson(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Mayah Perkins-Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Sharon Preston(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Junior Prophete(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Ernesto Quintero(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Keisha Richey(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Kayla Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Dina Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Refugio Villasenor(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Tara Walburger(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Rikki Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Lori Woodford(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Ayonna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Tera Clay(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Lachristy Colbert(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Lynn Ann Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Donna Corporon(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Katherine Decatur(pty:pla), Attorney Rod M. Johnston added to party Tiffany Denby(pty:pla), filed by Rikki Williams, Tara Walburger, Monique Lyttle, Donna Corporon, Sharon Preston, Kayla Anderson, Jaslyn Lanclos, Yahaira Alvarez, Jahmelia Lewis, Dina Smith, Aisha King, Junior Prophete, Mayah Perkins-Wilson, Ernesto Quintero, Latasha Hamilton, Tayzia Lowenstein, Vicki Patterson, Beverly Dilbeck, Refugio Villasenor, Destiny Dumas, Jazalene Marshall, Christian Ford, Latrice Odom, Keisha Richey, Lynn Ann Cooper, Ayonna Brown, Tiffany Denby, Laschelle Featherston-Olson, Crystal Jules, Katherine Decatur, Tera Clay, Lori Woodford, Jesse Lewis, Lachristy Colbert.(Johnston, Rod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons