California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:25-cv-01083
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:02 PM PDT
Defendant
Michael Joseph Favis
Plaintiff
Stephen Favis
1880 Charm Way
Sacramento, CA 95835


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/01 1:46 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/1/2025 GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days. The Clerk to send plaintiff a complaint form. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 05/01 1:46 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order served on Stephen Favis with complaint form. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/14 3:57 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Stephen Favis. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Joseph Favis by Stephen Favis. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Mon 04/14 3:58 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk KEZ)
Related: [-]