Jockel v. Luzerne County et al
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Karoline Mehalchick |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-02403 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 15, 2015 11:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Luzerne County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luzerne County Correctional Facility
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Piazza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Jockel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order)
Mon 08/29 3:55 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 8/29/2016. (cw) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/22 10:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In-person Status Conference set for 8/29/2016 11:00 AM in Scranton before Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 8/22/2016. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/10 4:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/19/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 8/10/2016. (cw) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 06/30 2:28 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Extend Time Motions due by 7/14/2016.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 6/30/2016 (cw) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 06/29 3:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza.(Wolff, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 02/29 12:23 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery due by 5/30/2016. Settlement due 5/30/2016. Dispositive Motions due 6/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 2/29/2016 (cw) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 02/26 3:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza.(Wolff, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Case Management Order - Standard Track
Wed 10/14 11:46 AM
ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK Discovery due by 3/1/2016. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 6/1/2016. Defendant Expert Report is due by 7/1/2016. Motions due by 4/1/2016. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 10/14/2015. (cw) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/29 4:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2015 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 9/29/2015. (cw) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
Tue 09/29 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M Wolff on behalf of Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza. (Wolff, Joel) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order - Consent to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge Approved
Mon 09/28 4:32 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick Approved. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 09/28/2015. (jw) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Document Filed
Fri 09/25 10:56 AM
by Susan Jockel. . (Fellerman, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Tue 09/22 1:30 PM
Letter from the Court to Counsel of Record re: consent to jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, enclosing Notice, Consent and Reference form for completion and filing. 9/24/15 Case Management Conference canceled. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 AO85 Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge | ||
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Case Management Plan
Mon 09/21 4:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Susan Jockel. (Fellerman, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/18 3:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 9/24/2015 10:30 AM in Wilkes-Barre - Courtroom 3 before Honorable A. Richard Caputo. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/18/15. (jam) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief)
Thu 07/23 11:13 PM
REPLY by Susan Jockel. to13 Answer to Complaint . (Fellerman, Gregory) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/10 2:37 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza.(Dean, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 06/02 2:03 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 7) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows:(1)Counts I, II, and V of the Complaint against Defendant Joseph Piazza are DISMISSED with prejudice.(2)Count VI of the Complaint against all Defendants is DISMISSED with prejudice. (3)The claim for punitive damages is DISMISSED with prejudice.(4)The demand for a jury trial on Counts II, III, and IV is STRICKEN from the Complaint. (5)The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/2/15 (jam) |
|
11 | 11
7
pgs
order
Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry)
Tue 06/02 2:01 PM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL) filed by Joseph Piazza, Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/2/15. (jam) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)
Tue 03/24 5:05 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL) filed by Susan Jockel.(Fellerman, Gregory) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief)
Tue 03/24 5:03 PM
RESPONSE by Susan Jockel to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL) . (Fellerman, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)
Wed 03/04 2:43 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL) filed by Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza.(Joyce, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 03/04 2:42 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (PARTIAL) by Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza.(Joyce, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
discov
Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures
Fri 02/27 1:59 PM
DISCLOSURE REPORT.(Fellerman, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 COS | ||
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/02 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Joyce, III on behalf of Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza. (Joyce, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
Mon 02/02 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Dean on behalf of Luzerne County, Luzerne County Correctional Facility, Joseph Piazza. (Dean, John) |
|
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures
Fri 01/09 3:17 PM
LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/9/15. (jam) |
|
Thursday, December 18, 2014 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/18 4:06 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Packet | ||
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/18 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-3305804), filed by Susan Jockel.(lh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits A to L, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits M to X |