Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:25-bk-43769
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 22, 2025

Debtor
UBSERVE, Inc.
6650 Higland Rd., Ste. 219
Oak Park, MI 48237
Represented By
George E. Jacobs
Bankruptcy Law Offices
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michael Stevenson
26100 American Drive Suite 500
Southfield, MI 48034


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 12:04 AM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
crditcrd none Mon 04/14 1:24 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-43769 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A43817762, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 04/14 10:52 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy : Fee Amount $338. Filed by UBSERVE, Inc. (Jacobs, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Mon 04/14 10:53 AM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor UBSERVE, Inc.. (Jacobs, George)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/14 10:53 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor UBSERVE, Inc.. (Jacobs, George)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (b) Mon 04/14 11:07 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Stevenson, Michael with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/22/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom - Stevenson: Meeting ID 405 739 1327, Passcode 0319210579, Phone 1 947 214 5410. (AJTA)
Related: [-]