New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:25-cv-03032
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332ct Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 11:05 PM EDT
Defendant
Fabulous Flowers of Tremont Ave Inc
3726 E Tremont Avenue
Bronx, NY 10465
Plaintiff
Norguard Insurance Company
39 Public Square
Wilkes-Barre, PA 18703
Represented By
Andrew Hunt
De Luca Levine, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/12 1:02 PM
MOTION for Joseph L. McGlynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Norguard Insurance Company..(McGlynn, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 05/12 2:11 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 9 MOTION for Joseph L. McGlynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 1:21 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Joseph L. McGlynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31016182. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Norguard Insurance Company..(McGlynn, Joseph) Modified on 5/1/2025 (bc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 3:00 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 8 MOTION for Joseph L. McGlynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31016182. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/16 4:17 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) to conduct all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. As further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/16/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/16 4:17 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/15/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/15 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fabulous Flowers of Tremont Ave Inc..(pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/14 10:54 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fabulous Flowers of Tremont Ave Inc, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Norguard Insurance Company..(Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/14 10:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 04/14 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew Hunt. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 316,997,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 317,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/14 10:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Andrew Hunt. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 04/14 10:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/14 10:21 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/14 10:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/14 10:25 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew Hunt to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney information section of Summons Form omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 04/14 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Dale E. Ho. Judge Cathy Seibel is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/14 5:07 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fabulous Flowers of Tremont Ave Inc, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Norguard Insurance Company..(Hunt, Andrew) Modified on 4/14/2025 (vf).
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT against Fabulous Flowers of Tremont Ave Inc. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30919129)Document filed by Norguard Insurance Company..(Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet