Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Case #: 4:25-cv-00754
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 1:06 AM EDT
Defendant
SWI, LLC
6150 W Yellowstone Hwy.,
Casper, WY 82604
Plaintiff
SHAPES UNLIMITED, INC.
590 E. Western Reserve Rd.,
Youngstown, OH 44514
Represented By
Oleg Khariton
Dinsmore & Shohl - Cincinnati
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
oth_evt Link to Local Patent Rules Tue 04/22 4:40 PM
This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to [LINK:Local Patent Rules] . (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
4 4 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Sat 04/19 8:37 AM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Shapes Unlimited, Inc.. (Khariton, Oleg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Fri 04/18 10:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Khariton, Oleg)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements Fri 04/18 2:13 PM
Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the [LINK:AO121 Copyright Report Form] or AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 5/2/2025. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 04/15 8:18 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon SWI, LLC. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 04/15 8:11 AM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 04/15 8:13 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 8:21 AM
Notice by Clerk that Shapes Unlimited, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 6:39 PM
Complaint with jury demand against SHAPES UNLIMITED, INC.. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-13051052.. Filed by SHAPES UNLIMITED, INC.. (Khariton, Oleg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2016 Fence Stiffeners Document,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - 2011 Eastern Metal Document,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - 12.09.2024 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D - 12.22.2024 Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. E - 01.13.2025 Letter,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Summons Proposed Summons