Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:25-bk-31358
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025

Debtor
Discount Plastic Bags & Packaging, LLC
7750 N Macarthur Blvd Ste 120 PMB 151
Irving, TX 75063-7501
Represented By
Victor Solyanik
Carrington Coleman
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert Yaquinto, Jr.
509 N. Montclair
Dallas, TX 75208
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 04/15/2025 12:03 AM CDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
crditcrd none Mon 04/14 7:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 7)([LINK 25-31358 7] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A32420633, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer) Mon 04/14 7:37 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Discount Plastic Bags & Packaging, LLC (Solyanik, Victor)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Mon 04/14 11:00 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Yaquinto, Robert, Jr. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 09:30 AM via Zoom - Yaquinto: Meeting ID 419 801 3103, Passcode 1902248619, Phone 1-469-218-9134. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is future date. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]