Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Eldon E Fallon
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:25-cv-00733
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 3:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Jack Griffin
Defendant
Mr. Mark G. Montiel, Jr.
Montiel Hodge, LLC 400 Poydras Street Suite 2325
New Orleans, LA 70130
Defendant
Montiel Hodge, LLC
Represented By
Melissa M. Lessell
Deutsch Kerrigan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lawson Nguyen
Defendant
Landis Silva Prestigiacomo
Defendant
Shelby S. Talley
Montiel Hodge, LLC 400 Poydras Street Suite 2325
New Orleans, LA 70130
Petitioner
Cat 5 Pro, LLC
Plaintiff
CAT 5 Coastal, LLC
Plaintiff
Cat 5 Global, LLC
Plaintiff
Cat 5 Restoration, LLC
Plaintiff
Cat 5 Xtreme, LLC


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
10 10 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Thu 05/15 11:13 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 Answer to Notice of Removal, Counterclaim: (1) Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. (2) Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (meb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 05/14 6:12 PM
Montiel Hodge, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against CAT 5 Coastal, LLC, Cat 5 Pro, LLC by Montiel Hodge, LLC.(Sheridan, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/29 12:19 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Montiel Hodge, LLC answer due 5/14/2025. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/29/2025. (amj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/23 12:42 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Montiel Hodge, LLC.(Sheridan, Joan) Modified on 4/23/2025 (amj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 04/23 10:32 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document 4 to document 3. Clerk properly linked document 4 to document 1 Notice of Removal. (amj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Tue 04/22 7:05 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Montiel Hodge, LLC (Lessell, Melissa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 04/22 7:03 PM
Notice of Compliance with Clerk's Directive by Montiel Hodge, LLC re3 Order.(Lessell, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/16 3:14 PM
Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal filed by Montiel Hodge, LLC.(amj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/15 8:13 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cmi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/14 6:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2025-02060 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10960129) filed by Montiel Hodge, LLC.Attorney Melissa M. Lessell added to party Montiel Hodge, LLC(pty:dft).(Lessell, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet